2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Cheung Kwok Wah |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Dr Chiu Chi Yue |
2013-07-01 | 2013-10-12 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Dr Holmgren Christopher Jonathan |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Dr Lam Fuei Kit |
2019-07-01 | 2019-11-07 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-04-07 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Dr Stanley-Baker Patrick Richard |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Tso Marianne Man Yin |
2020-07-01 | 2021-05-15 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2009-12-04 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-01-17 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-02-28 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2011-09-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Daniel Kwong On |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Daniel Kwong On |
2015-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-01-11 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Cheung Steven Ng Sheong |
2009-07-01 | 2010-01-11 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-01-11 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-01-11 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Fung Peter Chin Wan |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence |
2006-07-01 | 2006-12-12 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Hansen Chad |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Hansen Chad |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Hansen Chad |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Hansen Chad |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ho Faith Chi Suk |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kao Henry Shang Ren |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kao Henry Shang Ren |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2019-11-13 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Lam Wah Kit |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leong John Chi Yan |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leong John Chi Yan |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Mak-Lieh Felice |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Mak-Lieh Felice |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Moore Francis Charles Timothy |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Morton Brian Sydney |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Morton Brian Sydney |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Redding Stanley Gordon |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Saing Htut |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Saing Htut |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Shortridge Kennedy Francis |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Shortridge Kennedy Francis |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Tideman Henk |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Tideman Henk |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2001-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Wacks Raymond Ivor |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Wacks Raymond Ivor |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Walker Anthony |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Wei Stephen Hon Yin |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Yeung Chap Yung |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
1995-07-01 | 1995-11-19 | | Mr Griffiths David Alan |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | Mr Lu Leslie Lam |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-18 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-04-18 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2012-12-19 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Chan Ching Chuen |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Professor Chan Lau Kit Ching |
2012-07-01 | 2012-12-08 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Professor Chan Moira Mo Wah |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2009-11-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-03-31 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-03-31 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-03-31 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Professor Cho Chi Hin |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Professor Chwang Allen Tse Yung |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Professor Chwang Allen Tse Yung |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-01-31 | | Professor Corlett Richard Thomas |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | Professor Corlett Richard Thomas |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Professor Corlett Richard Thomas |
2006-07-01 | 2006-11-27 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Professor Dickman Michael David |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Professor Dixon Anthony Simon |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-01-21 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Professor Fletcher Paul Jeffrey |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Professor Frewer Richard John Barrett |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Professor He Guo-Wei |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Hill Ronald David |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
1995-07-01 | 1995-12-12 | | Professor Hoosain Rumjahn |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Hwang Kai |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Joseph John Earl |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-01-22 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Kvan Thomas |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Kwan David Chiu Yin |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Professor Lam Eric |
2006-07-01 | 2007-03-20 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum |
2012-07-01 | 2012-11-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Lau Chu Pak |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Lauder Ian James |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Lauder Ian James |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-01-09 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-03-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-02-28 | | Professor Leung Andrew Yee Tak |
1999-07-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Leung Benjamin Kai Ping |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
1999-07-01 | 1999-12-31 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-01-21 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Lie Ken Jie Marcel Soe Fa |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Professor Lim Shirley Geok Lin |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Professor Liu Ming Chit |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2012-12-08 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-03-31 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-01-31 | | Professor Marett Allan John |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Professor Marton Ference Istvan |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2007-03-31 | | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Professor Moeran Brian Dermot |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Professor Ngan Henry |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | Professor Nunan David Charles |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Professor Nunan David Charles |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Professor Nunan David Charles |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-03-21 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Professor Refsing Kirsten |
2018-07-01 | 2018-12-31 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Professor Sham Jonathan Shun Tong |
2012-07-01 | 2013-01-21 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Siu Man Keung |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-17 | | Professor Smart Philip St John |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-01-11 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Tambling Jeremy Charles Richard |
2005-07-01 | 2005-08-31 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2018-12-08 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-01-11 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Tong David Shuk Yin |
2001-07-01 | 2002-01-14 | | Professor Tong Howell |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-03-07 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-29 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1997-09-30 | | Professor Weatherhead Brian |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2017-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Wesley-Smith Peter |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2001-12-31 | | Professor Wong Kam Cheung |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Wong Kam Cheung |
2020-07-01 | 2021-03-31 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Wong Tak Ming |
1997-07-01 | 1997-11-30 | | Professor Wu Pui Chee |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-03-21 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2022-03-11 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |