Co-opted member | Academic Board | President and Vice-Chancellor | 2008-02-01 | 2009-06-02 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2008-01-31 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming |
|
Four teachers appointed by the Senate for a term of two years, with membership staggered at one-yearly intervals | Academic Board | | 1995-06-29 | 1995-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Tai Kwong | 2012-09-01 | 2014-08-31 | | | 2009-11-26 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leong John Chi Yan | 1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leong John Chi Yan | 1995-06-29 | 1995-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Lye Kum Chew | 2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Walker Anthony | 2006-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 1994-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | | 1988-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Professor Lee Ngok | 2009-11-26 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2007-10-01 | 2009-06-05 | | | 2006-10-24 | 2007-09-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-05 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-08-31 | | | 2009-11-26 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2011-09-01 | 2012-06-30 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Tong David Shuk Yin | 2009-11-26 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2011-09-01 | 2013-08-31 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming |
|
Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | Academic Board | | 2019-07-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2016-01-26 | 2019-06-30 | | | 1997-09-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1996-09-01 | 1997-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1993-09-01 | 1996-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1998-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | 1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | | | 1988-07-01 | 1997-03-31 | | | 2013-07-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2001-09-30 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1998-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1997-04-23 | 1997-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1991-04-23 | 1997-04-22 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2004-09-01 | 2008-01-31 | | | 2003-12-20 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-12-20 | 2003-12-19 | | | 2009-05-01 | 2010-09-30 | | | 2007-11-01 | 2009-04-30 | | | 2004-11-01 | 2007-10-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2003-12-20 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-12-20 | 2003-12-19 | | | 2015-01-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2009-03-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2009-02-28 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2003-09-09 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2012-12-13 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-12-13 | 2012-12-12 | | | 1998-04-01 | 2000-09-06 | | | 2000-05-01 | 2000-12-19 | | | 1997-05-01 | 2000-04-30 | | | 1988-07-01 | 1993-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 2015-03-01 | 2017-06-30 | | Mr So Douglas Cheung Tak | 2021-01-01 | | | | 2023-09-01 | | | | 2015-01-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2015-09-01 | 2020-01-31 | | | 2015-08-01 | 2019-01-13 | | | 2024-09-03 | | | | 2020-02-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2021-01-01 | | | | 2003-12-20 | 2004-12-19 | | | 2000-12-20 | 2003-12-19 | | | 2019-06-01 | 2021-06-30 | | | 2002-01-15 | 2004-09-21 | | Professor Tong Howell |
|
Provost and Deputy Vice-Chancellor (Vice-Chair) | Academic Board | | 1996-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 2015-08-01 | 2019-03-31 | | | 1992-12-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Biscoe Timothy John | 2010-09-01 | 2015-07-02 | | | 2019-04-01 | | | | 2009-09-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2009-08-31 | | |
|
Four teachers appointed by the Senate for a term of two years, with membership staggered at one-yearly intervals | Academic Board | Senate | 2016-09-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2014-09-01 | 2016-08-31 | | | 2020-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | | 2018-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | | 2022-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2022-08-31 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2023-09-01 | | | | 2017-09-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2024-07-01 | | | | 2022-07-01 | 2024-06-30 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2016-09-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2014-09-01 | 2016-08-31 | | | 2021-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2016-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | | 2014-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2015-09-01 | 2017-08-31 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2015-08-31 | | |
|
Secretary | Academic Board | | 2014-09-01 | | | Mrs Ching Rebecca Yuen Ling | 2005-08-01 | 2014-08-31 | | Mrs Hui Tania M | 1996-03-30 | 1996-03-31 | | Mr Smyth Colin Gowans | 1996-04-12 | 1997-04-06 | | Mrs Richards Jean Kathleen | 1998-06-24 | 2004-04-01 | | Mrs Tsang Renee Kwai Ling | 1997-04-07 | 1998-06-23 | | Ms Tang Violet Wai Chu |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor (Chair) | Academic Board | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1995-01-10 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
Provost and Deputy Vice-Chancellor or his/her nominee (Chair) | Academic Reviews, Advisory Group on | | 2015-08-01 | 2019-03-31 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2015-07-02 | | | 2019-04-01 | | | |
|
Nine professors appointed by the Senate for two years at a time, with membership staggered at one-yearly intervals | Academic Reviews, Advisory Group on | | 2011-09-01 | 2013-08-31 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2014-11-30 | | | 2010-11-23 | 2012-11-30 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2011-06-30 | | | 2016-09-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2016-12-01 | 2017-01-26 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-08-31 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-08-31 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2014-09-30 | 2016-08-31 | | | 2015-09-07 | 2017-08-31 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2011-09-01 | 2013-08-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-08-31 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2017-01-27 | 2018-11-30 | | | 2016-09-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2011-09-01 | 2013-08-31 | | | 2015-09-07 | 2017-08-31 | | | 2011-09-01 | 2013-08-31 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2016-09-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2016-09-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2015-09-07 | 2017-08-31 | | | 2016-09-01 | 2018-08-31 | | |
|
Nine professors appointed by the Senate for two years at a time, with membership staggered at one-yearly intervals | Academic Reviews, Advisory Group on | Senate | 2013-09-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2014-12-01 | 2016-11-30 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2022-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2022-08-31 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2022-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2022-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2023-10-31 | | | | 2021-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2022-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2014-09-01 | 2016-08-31 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2022-08-31 | | | 2018-12-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2014-09-01 | 2016-08-31 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2014-07-31 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-06-30 | | | 2014-09-01 | 2016-08-31 | | | 2021-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2014-09-01 | 2016-08-31 | | | 2023-10-31 | | | | 2022-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2022-08-31 | | | 2023-09-01 | | | | 2021-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2022-08-31 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2022-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2020-08-25 | 2022-06-30 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2022-08-31 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | |
|
Secretary | Academic Reviews, Advisory Group on | | 2023-07-01 | 2024-01-01 | | Miss Wong Vivian Tee Vee | 2010-09-01 | 2023-06-30 | | Ms Brodie Kaye Elizabeth |
|
Additional members co-opted by the Advisory Group | Academic Reviews, Advisory Group on | | 2022-09-01 | 2024-05-06 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2021-06-30 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2022-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2022-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2022-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2021-07-01 | 2023-06-30 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2022-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | |
|
Secretary | Academic Reviews, Committee on | | 1999-11-02 | 2001-02-19 | | Dr Huey Herbert Man Chiu | 1998-07-23 | 1999-11-01 | | Mrs Hill Alice Nyuk Foon | 2007-08-13 | 2010-08-31 | | Ms Brodie Kaye Elizabeth | 2001-02-20 | 2007-08-12 | | Ms Mak Ivy Suet Mui |
|
Vice-Chancellor (or a Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor)(Chairman) | Academic Reviews, Committee on | | |
Seven professors appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Academic Reviews, Committee on | Senate | 2008-01-01 | 2009-12-31 | | | 2006-01-01 | 2007-12-31 | | | 2003-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2002-01-26 | 2003-12-31 | | | 2008-01-01 | 2009-12-31 | | | 2006-01-01 | 2007-12-31 | | | 2003-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2002-01-26 | 2003-12-31 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2005-02-28 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-09-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-10-07 | 2000-08-31 | | | 2000-09-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kao Henry Shang Ren | 1998-10-07 | 2000-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Kao Henry Shang Ren | 2003-08-12 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2001-02-15 | | | 2001-02-16 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2007-05-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2005-05-01 | 2007-04-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2005-04-30 | | | 1998-10-07 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Walker Anthony | 2007-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2008-06-27 | 2009-04-18 | | | 2001-07-01 | 2003-04-30 | | Professor Fletcher Paul Jeffrey | 2005-03-18 | 2005-12-31 | | Professor Kvan Thomas | 2007-12-28 | 2009-12-31 | | | 2005-12-28 | 2007-12-27 | | | 2008-06-27 | 2010-06-30 | | |
|
Vice-Chancellor (or a Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor)(Chairman) | Academic Reviews, Committee on | President and Vice-Chancellor | 2000-01-01 | 2001-02-15 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1998-09-23 | 1999-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2004-12-20 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2003-12-20 | 2004-12-19 | | | 2001-02-16 | 2003-12-19 | | |
|
Provost & Deputy Vice-Chancellor or his/her representative | Accommodation Committee | Senate | 2001-01-01 | 2001-10-11 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-08-31 | | | 1999-01-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1997-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | 2004-01-01 | 2004-02-24 | | | 2001-11-27 | 2003-12-31 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Kwan David Chiu Yin | 2002-09-01 | 2004-02-24 | | |
|
The Chairman should be a member of the Senior Management Team appointed by the Campus Development and Planning Committee on the recommendation of the President and Vice-Chancellor | Accommodation Committee | Council | 2016-11-20 | 2017-11-19 | | | 2013-11-20 | 2016-11-19 | | | 2013-04-01 | 2013-11-19 | | |
|
A Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Council on the recommendation of the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Accommodation Committee | Council | 2010-11-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2007-11-01 | 2010-10-31 | | | 2004-11-01 | 2007-10-31 | | | 2013-04-01 | 2013-09-25 | | | 2004-03-15 | 2004-10-31 | | |
|
Secretary | Accommodation Committee | | 2011-07-01 | 2021-10-04 | | Miss Ho Seraphina Sau Ming | 1998-05-11 | 2003-04-30 | | Miss Ngai Yuen See | 1996-11-18 | 1996-12-23 | | Mr Lai Stephen King Kay | 1996-11-01 | 1998-05-10 | | Mrs Hill Alice Nyuk Foon | 2003-05-01 | 2011-06-30 | | Mrs Ma Leung Wendy Oi Ling | 2022-01-24 | | | Mr Sung John Chi Keung | 1996-10-01 | 1996-10-31 | | Ms Brodie Kaye Elizabeth |
|