Five Members elected by the Court | Court | Court | 2013-11-09 | 2016-11-08 | | Professor Yu Richard Yue Hong | 2010-11-10 | 2013-11-09 | | Professor Yu Richard Yue Hong | 2007-11-09 | 2010-11-08 | | Professor Yu Richard Yue Hong |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Court | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1986-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | Court | | 2016-12-20 | 2019-09-30 | | | 2019-07-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2016-01-26 | 2019-06-30 | | | 1997-09-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1996-09-01 | 1997-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1993-09-01 | 1996-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1998-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | 1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | | | 1994-04-01 | 1997-03-31 | | | 2013-07-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2001-09-30 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1998-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1997-04-23 | 1997-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1994-04-23 | 1997-04-22 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2004-09-01 | 2008-01-31 | | | 2003-12-20 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-12-20 | 2003-12-19 | | | 2009-05-01 | 2010-09-30 | | | 2007-11-01 | 2009-04-30 | | | 2004-11-01 | 2007-10-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2003-12-20 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-12-20 | 2003-12-19 | | | 2015-01-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2009-03-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2009-02-28 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2003-09-09 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2012-12-13 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-12-13 | 2012-12-12 | | | 1998-04-01 | 2000-09-06 | | | 2000-05-01 | 2000-12-19 | | | 1997-05-01 | 2000-04-30 | | | 1993-08-30 | 1993-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 2020-08-17 | 2022-04-30 | | Mr Lo Chit Ki Steve | 2015-03-01 | 2017-06-30 | | Mr So Douglas Cheung Tak | 2021-01-01 | | | | 2023-09-01 | | | | 2015-01-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2015-09-01 | 2020-01-31 | | | 2015-08-01 | 2019-01-13 | | | 2024-09-06 | | | | 2020-02-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2022-12-15 | 2024-01-19 | | | 2021-01-01 | | | | 2003-12-20 | 2004-12-19 | | | 2000-12-20 | 2003-12-19 | | | 2024-09-06 | | | | 2019-06-01 | 2021-06-30 | | | 2002-01-15 | 2004-08-31 | | Professor Tong Howell | 2024-01-20 | 2024-09-03 | | |
|
Not more than twenty members, not being already included in any of the foregoing classes, appointed by the Chancellor | Court | Chancellor | 1990-02-01 | 1996-01-31 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 1991-03-01 | 1997-02-28 | | Professor Poon Chung Kwong |
|
Twelve members elected from among its number by the Standing Committee of Convocation | Court | Convocation | 2012-09-22 | 2015-06-25 | | | 1967-09-01 | 1985-08-31 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing | 1999-09-01 | 2001-08-31 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 1999-09-01 | 2002-08-31 | | Ms Tsui Bernadette Wing Suen | 1992-07-01 | 1996-08-31 | | Ms Tsui Bernadette Wing Suen |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Court Life Membership Committee | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1986-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
The Dean of each Faculty | Court Life Membership Committee | | 1999-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1993-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | | 1996-01-10 | 1999-01-09 | | | 2005-09-01 | 2006-02-28 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2005-08-31 | | | 2011-09-01 | 2017-08-31 | | | 1999-01-10 | 2002-01-09 | | | 2011-03-01 | 2017-06-30 | | | 2009-10-19 | 2011-02-28 | | | 1995-06-30 | 1996-08-31 | | | 1995-03-01 | 1998-02-28 | | | 2019-07-01 | 2024-06-30 | | | 2014-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2003-07-31 | | | 2011-02-01 | 2016-01-31 | | | 2006-02-01 | 2011-01-31 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2007-03-12 | 2008-07-31 | | | 2003-08-01 | 2005-11-23 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-05-27 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2009-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2004-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | | | 1995-02-01 | 1997-02-28 | | Emeritus Professor Wei Stephen Hon Yin | 2011-08-01 | 2017-07-31 | | | 2010-11-01 | 2011-07-31 | | | 1993-01-10 | 1996-01-09 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2009-10-18 | | | 2005-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2022-07-01 | | | | 2017-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | | 2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2010-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2005-02-27 | 2006-02-07 | | | 2002-02-27 | 2005-02-26 | | | 1999-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai | 1994-01-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai | 1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1994-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | | 2007-05-28 | 2011-08-15 | | | 2016-02-01 | 2016-07-31 | | | 2020-07-01 | 2023-06-30 | | | 2015-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | | 2016-08-01 | 2021-07-31 | | | 2020-11-01 | | | | 2019-07-01 | 2020-10-31 | | | 2017-11-01 | 2022-06-30 | | | 2007-08-16 | 2010-07-03 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2022-07-31 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2014-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | | 2024-07-01 | | | | 2014-01-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 1999-02-27 | 2002-02-26 | | Professor Kvan Thomas | 2003-09-01 | 2007-03-20 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum | 2001-03-01 | 2003-08-31 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum | 2022-08-01 | | | | 2008-08-01 | 2013-07-31 | | | 2011-02-08 | 2011-03-30 | | | 2006-02-08 | 2011-02-07 | | | 2006-01-01 | 2006-01-31 | | | 2003-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2002-12-31 | | | 2010-07-05 | 2010-10-31 | | | 1999-09-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1996-09-01 | 1999-08-31 | | | 2018-08-01 | 2022-07-31 | | | 2013-08-01 | 2018-07-31 | | | 2014-01-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2010-11-24 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2005-11-24 | 2010-11-23 | | | 2011-01-06 | 2013-04-30 | | | 2023-07-01 | | | | 2006-03-01 | 2007-08-15 | | | 1997-03-01 | 1997-12-31 | | Professor Schwarz Eli | 2003-01-01 | 2003-12-31 | | Professor Smales Frederick Charles | 1998-01-01 | 2002-12-31 | | Professor Smales Frederick Charles | 2021-09-01 | | | | 2002-01-10 | 2005-01-09 | | | 1998-03-01 | 2001-02-28 | | | 2011-08-16 | 2012-06-11 | | | 2012-06-12 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2023-05-01 | 2024-04-30 | | | 2018-05-01 | 2023-04-30 | | | 2013-05-01 | 2018-04-30 | | | 2022-09-23 | | | | 1993-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Wesley-Smith Peter | 1996-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Will Barry Fegan | 1990-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Will Barry Fegan | 2002-07-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2001-01-01 | 2002-06-30 | | | 2021-08-01 | 2022-10-31 | | | 2022-07-01 | | | | 2024-05-01 | | | | 2022-11-01 | | | |
|
Secretary | Court Life Membership Committee | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | 1999-01-01 | 2000-07-23 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Mr Spooner Michael Garnet | 2002-04-01 | 2020-06-30 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2000-07-24 | 2002-03-31 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2020-07-01 | 2023-08-31 | | Ms Tsang Jeannie Wing Shi | 2023-09-01 | 2024-06-30 | | Ms Yue Dora Kar Man | 2024-07-01 | | | |
|
Up to four other persons co-opted by the Committee | Curriculum Development Committee | | 2008-06-19 | 2010-06-18 | | | 2006-06-19 | 2008-06-18 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-18 | | | 2004-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | |
|
Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Curriculum Development Committee | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1998-12-16 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2007-09-01 | 2009-09-29 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | |
|
A representative from each Faculty | Curriculum Development Committee | | 2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2004-05-17 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Dr Comfort Margaret Bell | 2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Dr Comfort Margaret Bell | 2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Dr Comfort Margaret Bell | 2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Dr Comfort Margaret Bell | 1999-03-04 | 2000-06-30 | | Dr Comfort Margaret Bell | 2003-09-01 | 2004-06-30 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2007-12-31 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-08 | | Dr Kyle William John | 2004-10-01 | 2005-06-30 | | Dr Kyle William John | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2004-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2001-08-27 | 2002-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 1999-03-04 | 1999-12-31 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | | 1999-03-04 | 2000-06-30 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1999-03-04 | 1999-06-30 | | Miss Ho Betty May Foon | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 1999-03-04 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai | 2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-02-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 1999-03-04 | 2000-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2004-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2006-10-01 | 2007-09-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | Professor Hui Cheuk Kuen Desmond | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | Professor Hui Cheuk Kuen Desmond | 2004-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | Professor Hui Cheuk Kuen Desmond | 2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Professor Hui Cheuk Kuen Desmond | 2002-09-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Professor Hui Cheuk Kuen Desmond | 2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Kvan Thomas | 2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Professor Kvan Thomas | 1999-03-12 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Kvan Thomas | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2005-04-07 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2004-04-19 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | | 1999-03-04 | 2000-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2004-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 1999-03-04 | 1999-12-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-01-31 | | | 2004-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | | 1999-03-04 | 2000-06-30 | | | 2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Levin David Allen | 2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Professor Levin David Allen | 2000-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Levin David Allen | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | Professor Mason Mark Bernard | 2004-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | Professor Mason Mark Bernard | 2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Professor Mason Mark Bernard | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2007-10-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2001-08-27 | 2002-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2008-01-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | Professor Smart Philip St John | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | Professor Smart Philip St John | 2005-01-01 | 2005-06-30 | | Professor Smart Philip St John | 2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Professor Smart Philip St John | 2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Professor Smart Philip St John | 2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Smart Philip St John | 2000-07-11 | 2001-06-30 | | Professor Smart Philip St John | 2001-08-27 | 2002-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | | 2000-07-11 | 2001-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2006-09-30 | | | 2006-05-09 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor (ex-officio) | Curriculum Development Committee | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2018-07-15 | 2023-07-14 | | |
|
Provost and Deputy Vice-Chancellor or a Vice-President and Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the President and Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Curriculum Development Committee | | 2012-12-13 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2009-09-23 | 2012-12-12 | | | 2015-01-01 | 2019-12-31 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2014-12-31 | | |
|
Other persons co-opted by the Committee | Curriculum Development Committee | | 2013-09-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2011-09-01 | 2013-08-31 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2016-01-01 | | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin |
|
Secretary | Curriculum Development Committee | | 2003-06-01 | 2005-03-31 | | Mr Shen Edward D | 2009-02-21 | 2009-09-27 | | Mrs Hui Tania M | 2007-06-15 | 2007-12-20 | | Mrs Hui Tania M | 2005-04-01 | 2005-07-31 | | Mrs Hui Tania M | 2005-08-01 | 2007-06-14 | | Ms Chong Irene Hiu Ching | 1998-12-16 | 2003-05-31 | | Ms Wan Katherine | 2007-12-21 | 2009-02-20 | | Ms Wong Katherine Ka Wing |
|
The Deputy Vice-Chancellor or a Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Vice-Chairman) | Curriculum Development Committee | | 1999-01-28 | 2000-09-06 | | | 2003-12-20 | 2004-12-19 | | | 2000-12-20 | 2003-12-19 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2009-12-31 | | | 2004-12-20 | 2009-08-31 | | |
|
Secretary | Curriculum Development Committee | | 2014-09-01 | | | Mrs Ching Rebecca Yuen Ling | 2009-09-28 | 2014-08-31 | | Mrs Hui Tania M |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Curriculum Development Committee | Curriculum Development Committee | | 2009-09-01 | 2010-03-07 | | | 2018-01-15 | | | | 2016-04-01 | 2018-03-31 | | | 2011-02-23 | 2013-01-31 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2011-02-22 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2011-02-22 | | | 2011-09-01 | 2017-08-31 | | | 2011-02-23 | 2013-07-31 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2011-02-22 | | | 2013-07-17 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2011-02-23 | 2017-07-31 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2011-02-22 | | | 2011-02-23 | 2012-11-25 | | | 2014-04-30 | 2017-06-30 | | | 2017-08-10 | 2018-01-15 | | | 2012-08-01 | 2012-11-25 | | | 2013-01-01 | | | | 2013-02-01 | 2017-02-28 | | | 2011-02-23 | | | | 2009-09-01 | 2011-02-22 | | | 2017-09-01 | | | | 2011-02-23 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2011-02-22 | | | 2015-11-24 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2012-11-26 | 2015-11-23 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2011-02-23 | 2013-07-16 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2011-02-22 | | | 2013-08-01 | | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-06-30 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2018-04-01 | 2019-12-31 | | | 2017-07-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2011-02-23 | 2014-04-29 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2011-02-22 | | | 2011-02-23 | | | | 2011-02-23 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2010-03-08 | 2011-02-22 | | |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Curriculum Development Committee | Curriculum Development Committee | Senate | |
A member of the Equal Opportunity Committee, appointed by that Committee (Chairman) | Disability Action Committee | | |