One postgraduate student representative, nominated by the Postgraduate Students Association. | Safety Health and Environment Committee | Postgraduate Students Association | 2010-11-23 | 2011-11-30 | | Mr Wong Nai Kei |
|
Officers in Attendance | Safety Health and Environment Committee | | 2015-12-01 | | | Dr Kildahl Ann Christine | 2005-03-24 | | | Dr Mackett Michael | 2005-03-01 | 2012-06-30 | | Mr Lam Philip Bing Lun | 2005-03-01 | | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2012-07-01 | | | Ms Lo Sau Mui |
|
One Dean of Faculty, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor. | Safety Health and Environment Committee | | 2005-06-01 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2017-06-12 | | | | 2014-01-01 | 2017-06-11 | | |
|
The Director of Safety (ex-officio). | Safety Health and Environment Committee | | 2014-09-01 | | | Dr Hau Ka Man | 2011-09-01 | 2014-08-31 | | Dr Hau Ka Man | 2008-09-01 | 2011-08-31 | | Dr Hau Ka Man | 2005-04-01 | 2007-06-30 | | Dr Mabbott Derek John | 2007-07-01 | 2008-08-31 | | Mr Lam Rheo Chun Kow |
|
Vice-Chancellor, or Deputy Vice-Chancellor or a Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Safety Health and Environment Committee | | 2012-09-01 | 2013-09-25 | | | 2005-04-24 | 2012-08-31 | | |
|
The Director of University Health Service (ex-officio). | Safety Health and Environment Committee | | 2005-04-01 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2015-12-05 | | | Dr Cheung Man Kuen | 2012-12-05 | 2015-12-04 | | Dr Cheung Man Kuen |
|
The Director of Estates (ex-officio). | Safety Health and Environment Committee | | 2017-07-01 | | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2013-08-01 | 2017-06-30 | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2013-07-01 | 2013-07-31 | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2005-04-01 | 2013-06-30 | | Mr Wong Kenneth Pak Keung |
|
Two teachers, one of whom shall be a head of a teaching department or a sub-division of studies and learning, appointed by the Senate. | Safety Health and Environment Committee | | 2011-09-01 | 2012-06-30 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2005-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2011-09-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2005-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2015-09-07 | 2016-09-30 | | | 2013-11-12 | 2015-11-11 | | | 2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
|
A member of the Senior Management Team, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman). | Safety Health and Environment Committee | | 2014-06-20 | | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | |
|
One non-academic staff representative, nominated jointly by the Academic Staff Association, University of Hong Kong Employees Union and The University of Hong Kong Staff Association. | Safety Health and Environment Committee | | 2005-05-05 | 2007-05-04 | | Mr Man Godfrey Shiu Kau |
|
Secretary | Safety Health and Environment Committee | | 2015-09-01 | | | Dr Chan Bethany Mee Yee | 2005-04-01 | 2013-09-05 | | Mrs Ma Leung Wendy Oi Ling | 2013-09-06 | 2015-08-31 | | Ms Tam Wing Yee Joanna |
|
Two teachers, one of whom shall be a head of a teaching department or a sub-division of studies and learning, appointed by the Senate. | Safety Health and Environment Committee | Senate | |
Secretary | School of Business, Board of Studies of the | | 1995-09-20 | 1995-12-31 | | Mr Cruddas John Wilfred | 1996-01-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Mr Prince John Henry | 1996-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Mrs Tsui Yeung Betty Man Wai |
|
Such other teachers, including part-time teachers of the School, as the Senate may appoint to the Board. | School of Business, Board of Studies of the | Senate | 1999-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Chan Wai Sum | 2000-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1997-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1997-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1999-07-01 | 2000-09-06 | | Dr Mak Brenda Lai Fong | 1998-11-03 | 1999-06-30 | | Dr Mak Brenda Lai Fong | 2000-06-10 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Smith Geoffrey Philip Shaw | 1999-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1997-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Cheung Steven Ng Sheong | 1999-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1997-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1999-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1997-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1997-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1997-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1999-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1997-07-01 | 1998-12-27 | | Professor Yen Jerome |
|
The teachers who have been organized by the Senate into the School of Business and who are full-time employees of the University. | School of Business, Board of Studies of the | | 1998-01-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1998-06-22 | 1998-09-21 | | Dr Cao Charles Quanwei | 1999-09-01 | 2000-08-31 | | | 2000-09-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Cheuk Terry Hon Fu | 1997-09-17 | 1998-01-16 | | Dr Courty Pascal Guy | 1995-08-01 | 1995-11-30 | | Dr Donleavy Gabriel Douglas | 1995-08-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Dr Frankenstein John | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1996-09-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1996-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Dr Kira Dennis Seiho | 1999-09-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Kwan Millie Miu Lan | 1998-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Leung Wai Kin | 1996-09-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Leung Wai Kin | 1996-09-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Lin Zhijun | 2000-09-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Lu Joe Zhou | 1995-08-01 | 1995-11-23 | | Dr Mok Yat Koon | 1995-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Newton James | 2000-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Petty Richard Michael | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Dr Petty Richard Michael | 1995-09-01 | 1996-08-31 | | Dr Piron Francis Maurice Valery | 1998-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Thompson Edmund Roy | 1996-08-20 | 1998-07-31 | | Dr Thompson Edmund Roy | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Tocquer Gerard Alcide | 1995-09-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Dr Tocquer Gerard Alcide | 1999-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Tse Wai Man | 1998-11-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Dr Tse Wai Man | 1995-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1996-09-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Ure John Colin | 1995-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Wong Man Yuen | 1995-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Dr Wright Robert Phillip | 1998-12-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Yik Michelle Siu Mui | 1997-08-29 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1995-08-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Redding Stanley Gordon | 1999-01-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Miss Lee Velma | 2000-08-30 | 2000-12-31 | | Mr Butt Yiu Yu | 1995-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Mr Chiu Edward Kai Chiu | 1995-08-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Mr Pyatt Thomas Roger | 1995-08-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Mrs Stewart Sally Elizabeth Acland | 1995-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Mr Tam Simon Kwok Wah | 1995-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Mr Whitman John David | 1995-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Mr Wong David Wai So | 1998-09-01 | 1999-08-31 | | | 1998-12-31 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Chang Jack Shih Kang | 2000-09-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Professor Chan Su Han | 1997-09-01 | 2000-08-31 | | Professor Chan Su Han | 1995-09-01 | 1997-08-31 | | Professor Chan Su Han | 1999-05-05 | 2000-12-31 | | | 2000-01-09 | 2000-04-08 | | Professor Child John | 1998-01-09 | 2000-01-08 | | Professor Child John | 1996-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Professor Han Jerry Chi-Ying | 2000-01-16 | 2000-12-31 | | Professor Hung Hing Kun Kineta | 1995-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1995-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 2000-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Professor Pan Yigang | 1998-08-01 | 2000-07-31 | | Professor Pan Yigang | 1995-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Reid David McHardy | 1998-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1995-08-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Tricker Robert Ian | 1998-04-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1996-04-20 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Tung Samuel Shui Liang | 1999-08-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Professor Zhou Chunsheng |
|
The Dean, or an Associate Dean, of the Faculty of Social Sciences, or a nominee representing the Dean. | School of Business, Board of Studies of the | | |
Vice-Chancellor | School of Business, Board of Studies of the | | 2000-11-08 | 2000-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung |
|
Such other persons not being teachers as the Senate may appoint to the Board, provided that the number of such persons shall not exceed one-fourth of the whole number of members of the Board. | School of Business, Board of Studies of the | Senate | 1996-01-26 | 1997-06-30 | | Dr Armitage Charles Albert |
|
The Director of the School of Business | School of Business, Board of Studies of the | | 1996-07-01 | 1997-04-30 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2000-09-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2000-08-31 | | | 1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1997-05-01 | 1997-06-30 | | |
|
The Chairman, who shall be a full-time teacher appointed by the Senate, and who is not a member of the School of Business. | School of Business, Board of Studies of the | Senate | 2000-11-08 | 2000-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1995-07-21 | 1996-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1996-07-01 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung |
|