Director, Language Centre | Senate | | 1987-04-23 | 1995-06-30 | | Dr Fok Chan Angela Yuen Yuen | 1995-09-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
|
2 teachers from each Faculty being members of the Board of that Faculty and not being Professors or the Heads of Teaching Departments, who shall be elected by the non-professorial members of the Board | Senate | Engineering Faculty Board | 2002-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | | 1999-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1996-10-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1992-11-11 | 1994-12-31 | | Dr Dunn Alan | 1981-07-01 | 1984-06-30 | | Dr Ho Chun Fai | 1999-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Dr Lam Fuei Kit | 1997-03-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Dr Lam Fuei Kit | 2002-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Chandler Adrian Mark | | 1993-06-30 | | Professor Chan Hon Chuen | 1995-01-01 | 1996-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1997-02-28 | | Professor Leung Andrew Yee Tak | 1994-02-20 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Leung Andrew Yee Tak | 1993-07-01 | 1994-02-19 | | |
|
1 Warden elected by the Wardens | Senate | Wardens of Halls | 1998-01-23 | 2001-01-22 | | | 1995-01-23 | 1998-01-22 | | | 2001-01-23 | 2003-10-31 | | Dr Hui-Bon-Hoa Max Lin | | 1994-10-31 | | Professor Cheong Weng Eang |
|
Secretary | Senate | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | 1999-01-01 | 2000-07-23 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Mr Spooner Michael Garnet | 2002-04-01 | 2020-06-30 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2000-07-24 | 2002-03-31 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2020-07-01 | 2023-08-31 | | Ms Tsang Jeannie Wing Shi | 2023-09-01 | 2024-06-30 | | Ms Yue Dora Kar Man | 2024-07-01 | | | |
|
Chairman of each Board of the Faculty | Senate | | 2007-05-28 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2018-07-01 | 2018-09-02 | | | 2015-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2018-11-01 | 2019-01-04 | | | 2019-08-01 | 2019-11-07 | | | 2016-08-01 | 2019-07-31 | | | 2009-04-08 | 2012-04-07 | | | 2010-10-01 | 2013-09-30 | | | 2008-09-15 | 2009-11-12 | | | 2005-09-15 | 2008-09-14 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2005-09-14 | | | 2003-11-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2004-10-26 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2008-07-21 | | | 2003-11-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2007-02-01 | 2010-01-31 | | | 2007-01-14 | 2008-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Hansen Chad | 2006-07-01 | 2007-01-13 | | Emeritus Professor Hansen Chad | 2004-01-14 | 2006-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Hansen Chad | 2016-11-14 | 2019-11-13 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2009-01-23 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-05-27 | | | 2022-01-01 | 2024-06-30 | | | 2019-01-01 | 2021-12-31 | | | 2015-04-08 | 2016-07-31 | | | 2012-04-08 | 2015-04-07 | | | 2004-03-23 | 2006-04-07 | | Mr Lu Leslie Lam | 2009-12-05 | 2012-06-30 | | | 2010-07-01 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2010-03-08 | 2013-03-07 | | | 2024-05-01 | | | | 2019-11-08 | 2022-11-07 | | | 2018-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | | 2015-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | | 2008-04-01 | 2009-03-31 | | | 2012-04-01 | 2015-03-31 | | | 2011-04-01 | 2012-03-31 | | | 2010-04-01 | 2011-03-31 | | | 2009-04-01 | 2010-03-31 | | | 2004-03-12 | 2007-01-31 | | Professor Corlett Richard Thomas | 2024-07-01 | | | | 2018-11-20 | 2021-11-19 | | | 2022-01-05 | | | | 2019-01-05 | 2022-01-04 | | | 2012-01-24 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2009-01-24 | 2012-01-23 | | | 2021-11-20 | 2024-06-30 | | | 2022-01-01 | 2024-06-30 | | | 2019-01-01 | 2021-12-31 | | | 2016-01-01 | 2018-12-31 | | | 2013-01-01 | 2015-12-31 | | | 2018-09-03 | 2018-10-31 | | | 2006-04-08 | 2009-04-07 | | | 2019-11-14 | 2022-07-31 | | | 2021-09-14 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2016-10-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2013-10-01 | 2016-09-30 | | | 2010-04-06 | 2010-09-30 | | | 2007-04-06 | 2010-04-05 | | | 2004-04-06 | 2007-04-05 | | | 2022-08-01 | | | | 2024-04-01 | | | | 2015-04-01 | 2018-03-31 | | | 2006-04-01 | 2007-03-31 | | | 2013-01-01 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2024-07-01 | | | | 2007-04-01 | 2008-03-31 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2008-11-01 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2016-03-08 | 2018-12-31 | | | 2005-04-01 | 2006-03-31 | | | 2004-04-01 | 2005-03-31 | | | 2003-11-01 | 2004-03-31 | | | 2017-01-01 | 2018-11-19 | | | 2014-01-01 | 2016-12-31 | | | 2024-07-01 | | | | 2012-11-13 | 2015-11-12 | | | 2009-11-13 | 2012-11-12 | | | 2014-07-22 | 2016-11-13 | | | 2011-07-22 | 2014-07-21 | | | 2008-07-22 | 2011-07-21 | | | 2015-11-13 | 2017-11-14 | | | 2013-03-08 | 2016-03-07 | | | 2024-07-01 | | | | 2021-07-01 | 2024-06-30 | | | 2013-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2010-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2005-10-11 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2023-11-15 | | | | 2020-11-15 | 2023-11-14 | | | 2017-11-15 | 2020-11-14 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2021-09-13 | | | 2021-04-01 | 2024-03-31 | | | 2018-04-01 | 2021-03-31 | | |
|
2 teachers from each Faculty being members of the Board of that Faculty and not being Professors or the Heads of Teaching Departments, who shall be elected by the non-professorial members of the Board | Senate | Business and Economics Faculty Board | 2001-09-13 | 2003-10-31 | | | 2001-09-13 | 2003-10-31 | | |
|
Director of the School of Professional and Continuing Education | Senate | | 1997-09-01 | 1998-01-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1997-07-01 | 1997-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 2008-02-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 1996-12-01 | 1997-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1996-11-30 | | Mr Howarth William Brian | 2021-07-20 | | | Professor Lee Keng Mun William | 2018-07-20 | 2021-07-19 | | Professor Lee Keng Mun William | 2015-07-20 | 2018-07-19 | | Professor Lee Keng Mun William | 1987-01-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Lee Ngok | 2006-02-01 | 2008-01-31 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming | 2003-02-01 | 2006-01-31 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming | 1998-02-01 | 2003-01-31 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming |
|
2 teachers from each Faculty being members of the Board of that Faculty and not being Professors or the Heads of Teaching Departments, who shall be elected by the non-professorial members of the Board | Senate | Law Faculty Board | 2001-01-01 | 2002-12-31 | | | 1999-01-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1995-01-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Mr MacNeil William Paul | 1992-01-01 | 1993-12-31 | | Mrs Stirling Gillian Margaret Grieve | 1996-10-23 | 1997-12-31 | | | 1993-01-01 | 1994-12-31 | | Mr Vanderwolk Jefferson Peck | 2003-06-18 | 2003-10-31 | | Ms Petersen Carole Joan | 2003-01-01 | 2003-10-31 | | | 1996-01-01 | 1996-10-22 | | Professor Booth Charles David | 1994-01-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Booth Charles David | 2002-01-01 | 2003-06-17 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2001-12-31 | | | 1997-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | 1998-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Smart Philip St John |
|
12 elected Professors (Group B) | Senate | | 2016-01-12 | 2019-01-11 | | | 2016-01-12 | 2019-01-11 | | | 2022-01-12 | | | | 2022-01-12 | | | | 2020-07-31 | 2021-07-31 | | | 2019-01-12 | 2022-01-11 | | | 2016-01-12 | 2019-01-11 | | | 2024-08-01 | | | | 2021-08-01 | 2024-07-31 | | | 2016-01-12 | 2019-01-11 | | | 2022-01-12 | | | |
|
12 elected Professors (Group C) | Senate | | 2016-03-22 | 2018-06-18 | | | 2022-03-22 | | | | 2019-03-22 | 2022-03-21 | | | 2016-03-22 | 2019-03-21 | | | 2022-06-14 | | | | 2017-06-30 | 2019-06-30 | | | 2022-11-08 | | | | 2019-11-08 | 2022-11-07 | | | 2019-04-17 | 2022-04-16 | | | 2018-05-16 | 2021-05-15 | | |
|
12 elected Professors (Group A) | Senate | Senate | 2018-12-13 | 2021-06-30 | | | 2019-01-09 | 2019-06-30 | | | 2017-04-01 | 2020-03-30 | | |
|
6 elected teachers, not being Professors (Group B) | Senate | | 2018-04-19 | 2021-04-18 | | | 2021-05-28 | 2024-05-27 | | | 2018-05-16 | 2021-05-15 | | | 2021-04-19 | 2023-10-31 | | |
|
6 elected teachers, not being Professors (Group C) | Senate | | 2019-11-08 | 2021-07-31 | | | 2018-05-16 | 2021-05-15 | | | 2021-08-05 | 2024-08-04 | | | 2022-12-06 | | | |
|
Dean of each Faculty | Senate | Council | |
Chairman of each Board of the Faculty | Senate | Architecture Faculty Board | |
12 elected Professors (Group B) | Senate | Senate | 2019-01-12 | 2022-01-11 | | | 2019-01-12 | 2020-07-30 | | | 2019-01-12 | 2022-01-11 | | |
|
Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | Senior Management Team and the Deans, Committee of the | | 2019-07-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2016-01-26 | 2019-06-30 | | | 2013-07-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2005-11-11 | 2008-01-31 | | | 2009-05-01 | 2010-09-30 | | | 2007-11-01 | 2009-04-30 | | | 2005-11-11 | 2007-10-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2005-11-11 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2015-01-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2009-03-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2009-02-28 | | | 2005-11-11 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2012-12-13 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-12-13 | 2012-12-12 | | | 2015-03-01 | 2017-06-30 | | Mr So Douglas Cheung Tak | 2021-01-01 | | | | 2023-09-01 | | | | 2015-01-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2015-09-01 | 2020-01-31 | | | 2015-08-01 | 2019-01-13 | | | 2020-02-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2021-01-01 | | | | 2019-06-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
|
Executive Vice-President (Administration and Finance) | Senior Management Team and the Deans, Committee of the | | 2013-09-25 | 2019-09-30 | | | 2020-08-17 | 2022-04-30 | | Mr Lo Chit Ki Steve | 2022-12-15 | 2024-01-19 | | | 2024-01-19 | | | |
|
The Registrar | Senior Management Team and the Deans, Committee of the | | 2005-11-11 | 2020-06-30 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2020-07-01 | 2023-08-31 | | Ms Tsang Jeannie Wing Shi | 2023-09-01 | 2024-06-30 | | Ms Yue Dora Kar Man | 2024-07-01 | | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Senior Management Team and the Deans, Committee of the | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2005-11-11 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|