The Dean of the Faculty of Medicine (Chairman) | Elaine G.C.F. Tso Memorial Fund Committee of Management | | 1995-03-01 | 1998-02-28 | | | 2007-03-12 | 2008-07-31 | | | 2003-09-01 | 2007-03-20 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum | 2001-03-01 | 2003-08-31 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum | 2022-08-01 | | | | 2008-08-01 | 2013-07-31 | | | 2018-08-01 | 2022-07-31 | | | 2013-08-01 | 2018-07-31 | | | 1998-03-01 | 2001-02-28 | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Elaine G.C.F. Tso Memorial Fund Committee of Management | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1997-05-09 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
The Donor or his representative | Elaine G.C.F. Tso Memorial Fund Committee of Management | | 1993-01-01 | | | Dr Tso Shiu Chiu |
|
A teacher of the Faculty of Medicine, nominated by the Donor or his representative, and appointed by the Senate | Elaine G.C.F. Tso Memorial Fund Committee of Management | Donor | |
The Head of the Department of Physiology | Elaine G.C.F. Tso Memorial Fund Committee of Management | | 2012-11-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 1992-07-17 | 1994-04-01 | | Professor Kwan David Chiu Yin | 2009-11-01 | 2012-10-31 | | | 1997-01-01 | 1999-11-10 | | Professor Pang Shiu Fun | 1994-04-02 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Pang Shiu Fun | 2003-04-06 | 2005-06-30 | | Professor Wong Tak Ming | 2000-04-06 | 2003-04-05 | | Professor Wong Tak Ming | 1999-11-11 | 2000-04-05 | | Professor Wong Tak Ming |
|
A teacher of the Faculty of Medicine, nominated by the Donor or his representative, and appointed by the Senate | Elaine G.C.F. Tso Memorial Fund Committee of Management | | 1995-08-17 | 1999-08-16 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse |
|
Secretary | Elaine G.C.F. Tso Memorial Fund Committee of Management | | 1994-11-13 | 1994-11-14 | | Mr Lee Dominic Yeung Fan | 1994-11-15 | 2001-02-11 | | Mrs Tsang Amy Wai Chee | 2020-07-01 | 2020-07-12 | | Ms Chan Vikkie Wai Kee | 2020-07-13 | | | Ms Ho Wing Ying | 2001-02-12 | 2008-08-31 | | Ms Tang Liza Meng | 2008-09-01 | 2020-06-30 | | Ms Tsang Jeannie Wing Shi |
|
One of the donors, or their representative | Elaine G.C.F. Tso Memorial Fund Committee of Management | Donor | 1993-01-01 | 1997-05-08 | | Dr Tso Shiu Chiu |
|
One of the donors, or their representative | Elaine G.C.F. Tso Memorial Fund Committee of Management | | 1992-03-01 | 1995-02-28 | | Emeritus Professor Ma Ho Kei |
|
Secretary | eLearning Committee | | 2015-10-20 | 2017-06-25 | | Miss Chan Trudi Shui Fan | 2017-06-26 | 2023-03-31 | | Mr Lam Shue Fung Ernest | 2023-04-01 | | | Ms Au Yeung Ming Wai Florrie | 2012-04-05 | 2015-10-19 | | Ms Leung Rebecca Miu Ping | 2012-12-01 | 2013-08-31 | | Ms Wan Katherine |
|
Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Infrastructure) | eLearning Committee | | |
Vice-President and Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Teaching and Learning) (Chairman) | eLearning Committee | | 2012-04-05 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2014-08-31 | | | 2015-01-01 | | | |
|
Executive Vice-President (Administration and Finance) | eLearning Committee | | |
President and Vice-Chancellor (statutory) | eLearning Committee | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-04-05 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
Librarian | eLearning Committee | | 2020-07-01 | 2021-05-09 | | | 2018-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | | 2012-04-05 | 2018-06-30 | | | 2021-05-10 | | | Ms Ng Flora Lai-kuen |
|
Director of Information Technology Services | eLearning Committee | | 2020-07-01 | 2021-05-09 | | Dr Ho Pui Tak | 2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | Dr Ho Pui Tak | 2017-06-26 | 2019-06-30 | | Dr Ho Pui Tak | 2012-04-05 | 2015-04-30 | | Dr Tang Danny Wah Hau |
|
Other members co-opted by the Committee | eLearning Committee | | 2019-09-02 | 2019-10-04 | | | 2019-09-02 | 2019-10-04 | | | 2021-11-05 | 2022-12-31 | | | 2019-11-05 | 2021-11-04 | | | 2017-11-05 | 2019-11-04 | | | 2015-10-20 | 2017-11-04 | | | 2019-09-02 | 2019-10-04 | | | 2023-01-01 | | | |
|
Associate Vice-President (Teaching & Learning) | eLearning Committee | | 2022-09-01 | | | | 2015-01-01 | 2019-12-31 | | |
|
Associate Vice-President (Teaching & Learning) | eLearning Committee | | |
Manager of Learning Environments | eLearning Committee | | 2018-11-19 | | | Dr Kwok Wai Shing Wilson | 2016-04-08 | 2018-10-07 | | Mrs Kelly Antoinette |
|