A nominee from each of the BASc Programme teams | Bachelor of Arts and Sciences Curriculum Committee | | 2019-09-24 | 2022-07-08 | | | 2019-07-01 | 2023-08-15 | | | 2022-08-01 | | | Dr Hoang Andrew Pau | 2019-07-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2019-07-01 | 2021-02-28 | | | 2022-06-13 | | | | 2020-09-01 | | | | 2023-09-01 | | | | 2021-03-01 | 2022-06-12 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2023-08-16 | | | | 2021-05-31 | | | | 2019-07-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2019-07-01 | 2019-09-23 | | | 2019-07-01 | 2021-05-30 | | |
|
Secretary | Bachelor of Arts and Sciences Curriculum Committee | | 2024-09-01 | | | Miss Ko Man Yi Rochelle | 2019-07-01 | 2021-10-05 | | Ms Ho Yuen Ping Katherine | 2021-10-06 | 2024-08-31 | | Ms Lai Ling Yam Yammy |
|
Co-opted members, if any | Bachelor of Arts and Sciences Curriculum Committee | | |
Vice-President & Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Teaching & Learning) (or his/her nominee) (Chair) | Bachelor of Arts and Sciences Curriculum Committee | Senate | |
President & Vice-Chancellor (statutory) | Bachelor of Arts and Sciences Curriculum Committee | Senate | |
Secretary | Board for Professional Doctorates | | 2013-09-02 | 2018-11-30 | | Miss Ho Wendy Tsui Man | 2018-12-01 | | | Ms Wong Anna Siu Chor |
|
An Associate or Assistant Dean of the Graduate School | Board for Professional Doctorates | | 2018-07-01 | 2018-07-31 | | | 2016-09-01 | 2018-04-30 | | | 2014-01-01 | 2015-12-31 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2013-12-31 | | |
|
Up to three teachers co-opted by the Board, on the recommendation of the Dean of the Graduate School, for two years at a time | Board for Professional Doctorates | | 2017-09-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2015-09-01 | 2017-08-31 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2017-11-30 | | |
|
The Dean of the Graduate School or his/her nominee (Chairperson) | Board for Professional Doctorates | | 2018-05-01 | 2018-07-31 | | | 2016-05-01 | 2018-04-30 | | | 2019-05-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2018-08-01 | 2019-04-30 | | | 2014-01-01 | 2016-04-30 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2013-12-31 | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor (statutory) | Board for Professional Doctorates | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2018-07-15 | 2023-07-14 | | |
|
Chairpersons of Faculty Higher Degrees Committees of Faculties offering PDD curricula | Board for Professional Doctorates | | 2013-09-01 | 2013-11-30 | | | 2015-01-01 | 2018-06-30 | | | 2018-09-01 | | | | 2018-07-01 | | | | 2017-07-01 | 2018-06-20 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2013-09-01 | | | | 2017-12-01 | | | | 2013-12-01 | 2018-08-31 | | |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Science Faculty Board | 2002-07-01 | 2002-12-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Dentistry Faculty Board | |
The Vice-Chancellor | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2007-09-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Education Faculty Board | 2000-09-26 | 2002-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2005-08-31 | | Professor Evers Colin William |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | School of Business | 1998-09-30 | 2003-06-30 | | Dr Wong Man Yuen |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Arts Faculty Board | |
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Law Faculty Board | 2002-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 1999-09-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Halkyard Andrew John |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Architecture Faculty Board | |
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Medicine Faculty Board | 2001-03-01 | 2003-10-12 | | | 1998-09-30 | 2001-02-28 | | |
|