Vice-Chancellor (or a Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor)(Chairman) | Academic Reviews, Committee on | President and Vice-Chancellor | 2000-01-01 | 2001-02-15 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1998-09-23 | 1999-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2004-12-20 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2003-12-20 | 2004-12-19 | | | 2001-02-16 | 2003-12-19 | | |
|
Provost & Deputy Vice-Chancellor or his/her representative | Accommodation Committee | Senate | 2001-01-01 | 2001-10-11 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-08-31 | | | 1999-01-01 | 2000-12-31 | | | 1997-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | 2004-01-01 | 2004-02-24 | | | 2001-11-27 | 2003-12-31 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Kwan David Chiu Yin | 2002-09-01 | 2004-02-24 | | |
|
The Chairman should be a member of the Senior Management Team appointed by the Campus Development and Planning Committee on the recommendation of the President and Vice-Chancellor | Accommodation Committee | Council | 2016-11-20 | 2017-11-19 | | | 2013-11-20 | 2016-11-19 | | | 2013-04-01 | 2013-11-19 | | |
|
A Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Council on the recommendation of the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Accommodation Committee | Council | 2010-11-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2007-11-01 | 2010-10-31 | | | 2004-11-01 | 2007-10-31 | | | 2013-04-01 | 2013-09-25 | | | 2004-03-15 | 2004-10-31 | | |
|
Secretary | Accommodation Committee | | 2011-07-01 | 2021-10-04 | | Miss Ho Seraphina Sau Ming | 1998-05-11 | 2003-04-30 | | Miss Ngai Yuen See | 1996-11-18 | 1996-12-23 | | Mr Lai Stephen King Kay | 1996-11-01 | 1998-05-10 | | Mrs Hill Alice Nyuk Foon | 2003-05-01 | 2011-06-30 | | Mrs Ma Leung Wendy Oi Ling | 2022-01-24 | | | Mr Sung John Chi Keung | 1996-10-01 | 1996-10-31 | | Ms Brodie Kaye Elizabeth |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Accommodation Committee | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2004-04-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2018-07-15 | 2023-07-14 | | |
|
Officers in Attendance | Accommodation Committee | | 2013-04-01 | 2015-12-31 | | | 2008-04-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2005-04-01 | 2008-03-31 | | | 2016-01-01 | 2020-08-31 | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin | 2003-12-01 | 2004-10-17 | | Dr Powell Ellis John | 2000-12-01 | 2003-11-30 | | Dr Powell Ellis John | 1999-10-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1999-07-01 | 1999-09-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1999-01-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1998-04-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1997-10-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1997-07-01 | 1997-09-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1997-04-07 | 1997-06-30 | | Mr Brandon William Peter John | 2021-09-15 | | | Mr Lo Tung Sing Tony | 1996-03-30 | 1996-03-31 | | Mr Smyth Colin Gowans | 1996-04-01 | 1997-04-06 | | Mrs Richards Jean Kathleen | 2023-07-01 | | | Mr Sy Wai Yin | 2020-07-01 | 2023-06-30 | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2017-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2013-08-01 | 2017-06-30 | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2013-07-01 | 2013-07-31 | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2010-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | Mr Wong Kenneth Pak Keung | 2000-03-01 | 2010-06-30 | | Mr Wong Kenneth Pak Keung | 2017-07-01 | 2021-09-14 | | Ms Lo Sau Mui | 2014-03-26 | 2019-06-30 | | Ms Lo Sau Mui | 2004-10-18 | 2005-03-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2000-11-30 | | | 2020-09-01 | | | |
|
Co-opted members | Accommodation Committee | | 2002-05-01 | 2004-04-30 | | | 2000-05-01 | 2002-04-30 | | |
|
Two teachers appointed by the Senate from departments in the Faculties of Architecture, Arts, Education, Law and Social Sciences, and the Centre of Urban Planning and Environmental Management | Accommodation Committee | Senate | 1998-04-15 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Ho Henry Chun Yuen | 1995-07-01 | 1998-04-14 | | Dr Rwezaura Barthazar Aloys | 2002-09-01 | 2004-02-24 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 0095-10-01 | 0097-12-30 | | Mr Leung Wai Kuen | 2002-09-01 | 2004-02-24 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-08-31 | | |
|
Four members of the University appointed by the President & Vice-Chancellor | Accommodation Committee | President and Vice-Chancellor | 2019-11-01 | 2022-06-30 | | | 2016-11-01 | 2019-10-31 | | | 2013-11-01 | 2016-10-31 | | | 2009-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | | 2007-04-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2004-04-01 | 2007-03-31 | | | 2021-01-01 | 2022-12-31 | | | 2019-04-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2016-04-01 | 2019-03-31 | | | 2013-04-01 | 2016-03-31 | | | 2010-04-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2007-04-01 | 2010-03-31 | | | 2004-04-01 | 2007-03-31 | | | 2014-07-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2018-01-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2015-01-01 | 2017-12-31 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2013-10-31 | | | 2010-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2007-04-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2021-01-01 | 2023-12-31 | | | 2019-01-01 | 2021-12-31 | | | 2015-04-01 | 2018-12-31 | | | 2012-04-01 | 2015-03-31 | | | 2010-04-01 | 2012-03-31 | | | 2007-04-01 | 2010-03-31 | | | 2004-04-01 | 2007-03-31 | | | 2004-04-01 | 2007-03-31 | | |
|
Two Teachers appointed by the Estates Committee | Accommodation Committee | Estates Cttee | 1989-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Dr Dunn Alan | | 1985-06-30 | | Dr Greene George William | | 1995-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Daniel Kwong On | 1995-07-01 | 1997-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Daniel Kwong On | 2004-01-01 | 2004-02-24 | | | 2002-01-01 | 2003-12-31 | | Professor Lau Sau Shing Patrick | 2000-01-01 | 2001-12-31 | | Professor Lau Sau Shing Patrick | 1998-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Lau Sau Shing Patrick | 1995-07-01 | 1997-12-31 | | Professor Lau Sau Shing Patrick | 1992-01-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Lau Sau Shing Patrick | 2004-01-01 | 2004-02-24 | | | 2002-01-01 | 2003-12-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2001-12-31 | | | 1998-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | | 1992-05-04 | 1995-06-30 | | |
|
A Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Council on the recommendation of the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Accommodation Committee | President and Vice-Chancellor | 1998-01-01 | 2004-02-24 | | | 1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | | | 1988-03-04 | 1997-03-31 | | |
|
The Chairman should be a member of the Senior Management Team appointed by the Campus Development and Planning Committee on the recommendation of the President and Vice-Chancellor | Accommodation Committee | Campus Development and Planning Committee | |
The Chairman should be a member of the Senior Management Team appointed by the Campus Development and Planning Committee on the recommendation of the President and Vice-Chancellor | Accommodation Committee | | 2022-05-16 | | | | 2019-10-01 | 2020-10-22 | | |
|
The Chairman should be a member of the Senior Management Team appointed by the Campus Development and Planning Committee on the recommendation of the President and Vice-Chancellor | Accommodation Committee | President and Vice-Chancellor | 2020-10-23 | 2022-04-30 | | Mr Lo Chit Ki Steve |
|
Provost & Deputy Vice-Chancellor or his/her representative | Accommodation Committee | | |
Vice-President & Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Research) | Accommodation Committee | | 2020-10-14 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2021-01-01 | | | |
|
Director of Finance or his/her designate | Advisory Committee on Donations | Council | 2017-06-28 | 2021-09-14 | | Ms Lo Sau Mui |
|
Director of Development & Alumni Affairs or his/her designate (as Secretary) | Advisory Committee on Donations | | 2017-06-28 | 2022-06-30 | | Ms Tsui Bernadette Wing Suen | 2022-07-01 | | | Ms Wong Isabella Yee Sin |
|
A Representative from the Deans appointed by the Deans from amongst themselves | Advisory Committee on Donations | | 2020-02-10 | 2022-02-09 | | | 2018-02-10 | 2020-02-09 | | |
|