Secretary | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | | 2024-07-09 | | | Mr Lam Shue Fung Ernest | 2003-07-01 | 2005-03-31 | | Mr Shen Edward D | 2009-02-21 | 2009-07-01 | | Mrs Hui Tania M | 2007-06-15 | 2007-12-20 | | Mrs Hui Tania M | 2005-04-01 | 2005-07-31 | | Mrs Hui Tania M | 2003-06-29 | 2003-06-30 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2009-07-02 | 2024-06-30 | | Ms Chau Wai Kam Synthia | 2005-08-01 | 2007-06-14 | | Ms Chong Irene Hiu Ching | 2007-12-21 | 2009-02-20 | | Ms Wong Katherine Ka Wing |
|
Vice-President and Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Research) (ex-officio) | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | | 2015-01-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2012-12-21 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2015-09-01 | 2020-01-31 | | | 2020-02-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2021-01-01 | | | |
|
The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Social Sciences Faculty Board | 1999-01-25 | 2000-02-20 | | Dr Chiu Chi Yue | 1996-10-01 | 1999-01-09 | | | 2002-02-04 | 2005-01-09 | | |
|
The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Dentistry Faculty Board | 1999-01-11 | 2000-11-01 | | | 1995-02-20 | 1999-01-10 | | |
|
The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | | 2013-01-01 | 2013-07-25 | | | 2000-02-21 | 2002-02-03 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2004-11-07 | | | 2024-09-01 | | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-12-31 | | | 2017-08-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2004-11-08 | 2006-05-01 | | Dr Kyle William John | 2009-03-01 | 2009-10-06 | | | 2008-03-01 | 2009-02-28 | | | 2016-04-01 | 2018-03-31 | | | 2008-05-06 | 2013-01-31 | | | 2005-09-01 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2011-09-01 | 2011-11-10 | | | 1999-01-10 | 1999-01-24 | | | 2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2009-07-17 | 2012-05-27 | | | 2010-10-07 | 2011-10-06 | | | 2009-10-07 | 2010-10-06 | | | 2005-09-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2003-09-01 | 2005-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2003-08-31 | | | 2013-07-01 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2012-10-07 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2011-10-07 | 2012-10-06 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2014-04-23 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2010-12-14 | | | 2011-01-01 | 2012-11-25 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2008-09-08 | | | 2004-11-01 | 2005-09-20 | | | 2021-08-01 | | | | 2016-10-20 | 2018-10-16 | | | 2014-10-11 | 2016-10-16 | | | 2013-07-26 | 2014-10-10 | | | 2014-12-01 | 2017-07-31 | | | 2023-08-01 | | | | 2012-08-01 | 2012-11-25 | | | 2011-09-01 | 2013-07-13 | | | 2021-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2024-01-01 | | | | 2007-07-01 | 2008-02-29 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2001-10-26 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2007-01-01 | 2008-05-05 | | | 2006-02-01 | 2006-12-31 | | | 2003-01-01 | 2004-12-31 | | | 2004-11-22 | 2014-07-02 | | | 2013-02-01 | 2017-02-28 | | | 2011-11-11 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2011-01-01 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2010-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2023-07-01 | | | | 2001-04-01 | 2002-09-27 | | Professor Han Jerry Chi-Ying | 2016-03-01 | 2017-08-31 | | | 2013-07-14 | 2015-07-31 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2023-06-30 | | | 2014-07-01 | 2017-10-06 | | | 2015-11-24 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2012-11-26 | 2015-11-23 | | | 2000-01-31 | 2001-10-25 | | Professor Kvan Thomas | 2005-09-21 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2017-07-01 | 2019-05-31 | | | 2014-07-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2014-07-03 | 2018-07-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2005-08-31 | | | 2013-07-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2011-02-01 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2001-09-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 2000-01-17 | 2006-01-31 | | | 2018-08-01 | | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-06-30 | | | 2020-01-01 | | | Professor Leung Shek Ling Olivia | 2010-07-01 | 2011-01-31 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2010-12-15 | 2013-08-31 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2008-12-08 | | | 2021-01-01 | | | | 2011-01-01 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2010-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2014-04-24 | 2014-11-30 | | | 2022-10-17 | 2024-08-31 | | | 2008-01-01 | 2009-12-31 | | | 2004-03-10 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2000-11-02 | 2004-03-09 | | | 2008-12-09 | 2009-12-31 | | | 2021-07-30 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2008-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2018-04-01 | | | | 2017-09-15 | 2019-12-31 | | | 2007-09-19 | 2009-07-16 | | | 2018-10-17 | 2022-10-16 | | | 2016-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | | 2015-01-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2017-12-12 | 2019-09-10 | | | 2017-03-01 | 2021-07-31 | | | 2006-05-02 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2002-09-30 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2020-07-01 | 2023-06-30 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2008-09-09 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2006-02-14 | 2007-12-31 | | |
|
The Chairman of the Senate Higher Degrees Committee | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Senate | 1995-07-01 | 1998-10-05 | | Emeritus Professor Moore Francis Charles Timothy |
|
The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | School of Business | 1997-02-27 | 2001-03-31 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Teaching Quality Committee, and the Chairman of the Teaching Quality Committee of the School of Business | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Science Faculty Board | 1994-12-13 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai |
|
The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Architecture Faculty Board | |
The Chairman of each Faculty Teaching Quality Committee, and the Chairman of the Teaching Quality Committee of the School of Business | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Engineering Faculty Board | 1995-07-01 | 1996-09-15 | | Dr Lingard Stephen |
|
The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Education Faculty Board | 1998-12-14 | 2002-08-31 | | Dr Day Jeffrey Richard | 1995-04-20 | 1998-12-13 | | Mr Lopez-Real Francis Joseph |
|
The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Medicine Faculty Board | |
Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
The Dean of Student Affairs | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | | 2013-04-01 | 2015-12-31 | | | 2008-04-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2016-01-01 | 2020-08-31 | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin | 2020-09-01 | | | |
|
The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Law Faculty Board | 1996-09-01 | 2001-08-31 | | Mrs Carver Anne Rosamunde |
|
The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Engineering Faculty Board | |
Provost and Deputy Vice-Chancellor or a Vice-President and Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the President and Vice-Chancellor (Chair) | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | | 1997-09-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1996-09-01 | 1997-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1994-03-01 | 1996-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 2012-12-13 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2008-01-01 | 2012-12-12 | | | 1998-04-01 | 2000-09-06 | | | 2020-01-01 | | | | 2015-01-01 | 2019-12-31 | | | 2003-12-20 | 2004-12-19 | | | 2000-12-20 | 2003-12-19 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2004-12-20 | 2007-12-31 | | |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Teaching Quality Committee, and the Chairman of the Teaching Quality Committee of the School of Business | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Dentistry Faculty Board | |
Chairman, Policy Board of Postgraduate Education | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | | 2000-12-20 | 2003-09-08 | | | 2015-01-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2009-03-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2009-02-28 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2003-09-09 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-05-01 | 2000-12-19 | | | 1998-11-13 | 2000-04-30 | | | 2015-09-01 | 2019-08-31 | | |
|
The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Science Faculty Board | 1994-01-01 | 2001-09-30 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai |
|