President & Vice-Chancellor | Library Committee | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1986-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Library Committee and the Chairman of the Committee on Information Technology and Educational Resources (CITER) of the Faculty of Dentistry | Library Committee | Senate | 2017-07-01 | 2019-12-30 | | | 2017-03-11 | 2019-03-10 | | |
|
The Dean or Associate Dean of each Faculty, or his/her nominee | Library Committee | Senate | |
One member appointed by the Senate for two years at a time, renewable to a maximum of four consecutive years, from amongst the staff of the HKIHSS, and HKU SPACE | Library Committee | | 2018-02-18 | 2019-12-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony |
|
Chief Information Officer and University Librarian or his/her nominee | Library Committee | | 2021-05-10 | | | Ms Ng Flora Lai-kuen |
|
Director of Library Services | Library Committee | | |
The Provost & Deputy Vice-Chancellor or a Vice-President & Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the President & Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Library Committee | | 2021-07-01 | | | | 2019-04-17 | 2020-01-22 | | | 2020-01-23 | 2021-06-30 | | |
|
Librarian | Library Committee | | 2020-07-01 | 2021-05-09 | | | 2019-12-30 | 2020-06-30 | | | 2021-05-10 | | | Ms Ng Flora Lai-kuen |
|
Deputy Librarian | Library Committee | | |
The Director of HKU SPACE or his/her nominee | Library Committee | | 2024-02-18 | | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2022-02-18 | 2024-02-17 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2020-02-18 | 2022-02-17 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2019-12-30 | 2020-02-17 | | Professor Lee Keng Mun William |
|
A Vice-President and Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the President and Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Louis Cha Fund Committee of Management | President and Vice-Chancellor | 1997-01-01 | 1997-02-28 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2001-03-20 | 2003-09-08 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2009-02-28 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2003-09-09 | 2004-08-31 | | | 1997-05-01 | 2000-04-30 | | | 1997-03-01 | 1997-04-30 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2015-09-16 | 2020-01-31 | | |
|
A teacher, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Louis Cha Fund Committee of Management | Senate | 2003-10-07 | 2004-06-30 | | Dr Sinn Yuk Yee Elizabeth | 2001-09-01 | 2003-08-31 | | Dr Sinn Yuk Yee Elizabeth | 1999-09-01 | 2001-08-31 | | Dr Sinn Yuk Yee Elizabeth | 1998-07-01 | 1999-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence | 2015-01-01 | 2016-12-31 | | | 2013-01-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2011-01-01 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2004-07-13 | 2006-06-30 | | | 1988-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Professor Chen Edward Kwan Yiu | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Tatlow Antony Tissington |
|
A Vice-President and Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the President and Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Louis Cha Fund Committee of Management | | 2015-01-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2014-09-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-08-31 | | | 2009-03-01 | 2012-08-31 | | |
|
Secretary | Louis Cha Fund Committee of Management | | 1994-09-15 | 1997-04-02 | | Mr Barry Michael Hall | 2005-04-01 | 2017-07-02 | | Mr Shen Edward D | 1998-05-11 | 2005-03-31 | | Mrs Hui Tania M | 1992-09-07 | 1994-09-14 | | Mrs Tsang Renee Kwai Ling | 2017-08-28 | | | Ms Kwok Francisca Suk Wai |
|
One member of the Board of the Faculty of Arts electd by the Board for two years at a time | Louis Cha Fund Committee of Management | Arts Faculty Board | 2013-08-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2011-08-01 | 2013-07-31 | | | 2007-08-01 | 2009-07-31 | | | 2005-08-01 | 2007-07-31 | | | 2003-08-01 | 2005-07-31 | | | 2001-08-01 | 2003-07-31 | | | 1999-08-01 | 2001-07-31 | | | 1998-09-01 | 1999-07-31 | | | 2009-08-01 | 2011-07-31 | | | 1997-08-01 | 1998-08-31 | | | 1995-08-01 | 1997-07-31 | | | 1993-08-01 | 1995-07-31 | | | 2015-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
|
Head, School of Chinese | Louis Cha Fund Committee of Management | | 2012-12-05 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2008-12-01 | 2011-11-30 | | | 1997-01-01 | 1998-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 1988-07-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 2004-09-01 | 2007-11-30 | | | 2001-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | | 1998-09-01 | 2001-08-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2021-05-31 | | | 2015-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | |
|
Dean of Arts | Louis Cha Fund Committee of Management | | 1999-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1993-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2003-07-31 | | | 2003-08-01 | 2005-11-23 | | | 2020-07-01 | 2023-06-30 | | | 2015-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | | 2014-01-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 1988-07-01 | 1993-06-30 | | Professor Leung Chi Keung | 2010-11-24 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2005-11-24 | 2010-11-23 | | | 2023-07-01 | | | |
|
A teacher, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Louis Cha Fund Committee of Management | | |
One member of the Board of the Faculty of Arts electd by the Board for two years at a time | Louis Cha Fund Committee of Management | | |
Chairman, Dental Illustration Unit Committee of Management | Media Resources, Committee on | | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Dr Zee Kwan Yat |
|