Smethurst, P
Name Card
Dr Smethurst, Paul
Title:
Honorary Associate Professor
Department:
Faculty:
Supervision of Research Postgraduate Students
Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
Experiments in Subjectivity: A Study of Postmodern Science Fiction | Postmodernism (Postmodern Reality: An Account of the Displacement of Reality in Simulacrum and Virtual Reality) | 2003 MPhil Kwan Wing Ki Koren | |
The Silent Eye: Approaches to Aporia in Modern Literature | Postcolonial Studies | 2007 Phd Wong Yuk Yin Bobo | |
Towards an Aesthetics of Cliche: Cultural Recycling and Contemporary Fiction | Postmodern Fiction | 2006 MPhil Chan Wing Chun Julia | |
'All is Not Well in the World': Critical Cosmopolitanism in Twenty-First Century Fiction | Study of cosmopolitanism in contemporary fiction | 2008 Phd Lee Jason Eng Hun | |
The Ends of History: The Novels of Kazuo Ishiguro, Timothy Mo and Graham Swift | Contemporary British Fiction | 2003 MPhil Mok Siu Kit | |
The Unmaking of Heroes: A Study of Masculinity in Contemporary Fiction | Contemporary British Fiction | 2003 MPhil White Patricia So Fong |
HKU Committee Appointments
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2014-09-01 | 2015-05-31 | Faculty of Arts, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2015-09-01 | 2016-05-31 | Faculty of Arts, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2006-06-01 | 2014-06-30 | Faculty of Arts, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2002-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | Faculty of Social Sciences, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2009-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | Discontinuation, Committee on | 1 member from each Faculty (Arts) from a panel of three in order of precedence for a period of 2 years, renewable up to a maximum of 4 consecutive years | Arts Faculty Board |
2007-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | Discontinuation, Committee on | 1 member from each Faculty (Arts) from a panel of three in order of precedence for a period of 2 years, renewable up to a maximum of 4 consecutive years | Arts Faculty Board |
1997-03-01 | 2000-06-30 | Faculty of Arts, Board of the | Lecturers in Faculty | |
2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | Faculty of Arts, Board of the | Lecturers in Faculty | |
2003-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | Faculty of Arts, Board of the | Lecturers in Faculty |
Are You Missing Publications, Invited Lectures? Click Me.