Term | Code | Class | Title |
---|---|---|---|
2019 S2 | PMBA6010 | 2A | Strategic Marketing Management |
2019 S8 | MSMK7005 | SA | Business Model Design & Marketing Innovation |
2019 S1 | MSMK7001 | 1A | Strategic Marketing Management |
2020 S2 | MSMK7005 | 2A | Business Model Design & Marketing Innovation |
2020 S2 | MSMK7005 | 2B | Business Model Design & Marketing Innovation |
2018 S2 | PMBA6010 | 2A | Strategic Marketing Management |
2018 S2 | PMBA6010 | 2B | Strategic Marketing Management |
2019 S8 | PMBA6010 | SB | Strategic Marketing Management |
2020 S2 | PMBA6010 | 2A | Strategic Marketing Management |
2020 S2 | PMBA6010 | 2B | Strategic Marketing Management |
Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
Three Essays on Consumer Behavior in Virtual Community: eWOM, Online Trust, and Dynamic Impacts on Brand Selection | Marketing | 2003 Phd Li Yiyan | |
Current Challenges in Channel Relationships | Marketing in the Chinese Economy | 2004 Phd Dong Chuoyan | |
Managing Co-creation in New Product Development in Multinational Corporations: A Two-Part Study | Marketing | 2012 Phd Leung Fine | |
Three Studies on Business-to-Business Relations: Effects of Fairness, Guanxi, and National Animosity on Firm Performance in China | Marketing | 2001 Phd Gu Fang | |
Brand Effects and Brand Dominance in Transitional Economies: A Longitudinal Study on Brands in China | Marketing | 1998 MPhil Li Xiaolian | |
External Organizational Learning and Firm Performance | Marketing | 2002 Phd Chen Xiaoyun | |
Three Studies on Understanding Customer Relationship Management in Services: Customer-Firm Affection, Customer-Staff Proximity, and Customer-Firm Coproduction | Consumer Satisfaction Management | 2004 Phd Chan Wa |
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2016-09-01 | 2018-08-31 | Academic Reviews, Advisory Group on | Nine professors appointed by the Senate for two years at a time, with membership staggered at one-yearly intervals | |
2014-09-01 | 2016-08-31 | Academic Reviews, Advisory Group on | Nine professors appointed by the Senate for two years at a time, with membership staggered at one-yearly intervals | Senate |
1998-04-01 | 2005-06-21 | Appointment of Professors and Readers, Board for the | The Professors, provided that Emeritus Professors, Honorary Professors and part-time professors shall not be members under this category | |
1998-04-01 | 2000-12-31 | School of Business, Board of Studies of the | The teachers who have been organized by the Senate into the School of Business and who are full-time employees of the University. | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
1998-04-01 | 2003-10-31 | Senate | Professors | |
2004-02-13 | 2006-02-12 | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | 6 members from the University, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2000-02-18 | 2004-01-27 | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | Two additional Senate members, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | President and Vice-Chancellor |
2004-01-01 | 2004-06-30 | Selection of Professional and Administrative Staff, Committee for the | A member of the University Selection and Promotion Committee, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | BAPR |
2002-01-01 | 2003-12-31 | Selection of Senior Teachers, Committee for the | 3 Professors:1 from the following groups of Faculty A: Dentistry/Medicine B: Engineering/Science/Architecture C: Arts/Bus & Econ/Education/Law/Soc Sci | BAPR |
2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | Faculty of Business and Economics, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | Faculty of Business and Economics, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2014-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | Faculty of Business and Economics, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2001-01-01 | 2014-06-30 | Faculty of Business and Economics, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University |