Name Card
Emeritus Professor Ho, Pak Chung 何柏松
Title:
Chair Professor
Honorary Professor
Department:
Faculty:
Supervision of Research Postgraduate Students
Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
Glycodelin-A as a Modulator of Trophoblast Invasion | Reproductive Biology | 2007 Phd Lam Ka Wai | |
Application of ultrasonography in early pregnancy | Antenatal diagnosis & prenatal ultrasound examination: sonographic detection of fetal abnormalities in the first & second trimester | 2001 Phd Chen Min | |
The Expression and Role of ADAMTS9 During Differentiation of Human Embryonic Stem Cells | Reproductive Medicine | 2009 MPhil Xin Mankun | |
Development and Application of a Single Mouse Embryo DNA Methylation-Detection Assay | Reproductive Medicine | 2011 MPhil Kwan Chun Kit | |
Ex vivo Expansion, microRNA Expression and Immortalization of CD34+ Cells Derived from Human Umbilical Cord Blood | Perinatology | 2007 Phd Kwok Ka Yin | |
Effects of cumulus oophorus and glycodelin-F on human spermatozoa during fertilization | Reproductive Biology | 1999 Phd Hong Shunjia | |
Intimate partner violence and chronic pain among Chinese women | Intimate Partner Violence and Posttraumatic Stress Disorder | 2008 MPhil Chan Chee Hon | |
Sperm Fucosyltransferase-5 Mediates the Sperm-oviductal Epithelial Cell Interaction to Protect Human Sperm from Oxidative Damage | Reproductive Medicine | 2011 Phd Huang Wenxin | |
An Exploratory Study on Spirituality and Psychosocial Well-being in Chinese Breast Cancer Patients | Perception of emotional control, body-sexual esteem, and psychosocial health of breast cancer patients in Hong Kong | 2004 Phd Chan Yu | |
Human endometrial gene expression profiling and receptivity in patients undergoing in vitro fertilization (IVF) treatment | Reproductive Biology | 2006 Phd Liu Yunao | |
Investigation on the spermatozoa - zona binding inhibitory factors from human follicular fluid | Reproductive Biology | 1996 MPhil Chiu Chi Ngong Philip | |
The rotes of protein disulphide isomerase family A, member 3 (ERp57) and surface thiol/disulphide exchange in human spermatozoa-zona pellucida binding | Reproductive Medicine | 2012 Phd Wong Chi Wai |
HKU Committee Appointments
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
1987-11-01 | 1996-03-31 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | Readers in Faculty | |
1997-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | Study Leave, Committee on | One member of the Senate, appointed by the Senate (Vice-Chairman) | Senate |
2008-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | Personnel Matters, Committee on | Four teachers, of whom two shall be members of the Senate elected by the Senate, and two appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | President and Vice-Chancellor |
2011-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | Personnel Matters, Committee on | Four teachers, of whom two shall be members of the Senate elected by the Senate, and two appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1995-07-01 | 1996-03-31 | Senate | Other Heads of Teaching Department | |
2006-08-04 | 2009-07-31 | Conditions of Service Committee | Two members of the University, appointed by the Human Resource Policy Committee | |
2004-03-01 | 2004-09-15 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1996-04-01 | 2003-10-31 | Senate | Professors | |
1996-04-01 | 2005-06-21 | Appointment of Professors and Readers, Board for the | The Professors, provided that Emeritus Professors, Honorary Professors and part-time professors shall not be members under this category | |
1996-04-01 | 2010-06-30 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2010-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2013-07-01 | 2013-09-30 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2005-01-01 | 2007-12-31 | Personnel Matters, Committee on | Four teachers, of whom two shall be members of the Senate elected by the Senate, and two appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | |
1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | University Health Services Committee | A member of a Clinical Department of the Faculty of Medicine, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | University Health Services Committee | A member of a Clinical Department of the Faculty of Medicine, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | University Health Services Committee | A member of a Clinical Department of the Faculty of Medicine, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | University Health Services Committee | A member of a Clinical Department of the Faculty of Medicine, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | Enquiry into Possible Good Cause, Committee of | A panel of 12 members of the Senate who are teachers, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
1995-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | Research and Conference Grants, Committee on | One other member (not being the Dean or Associate Dean) of each Faculty Board appointed by the Board | Medicine Faculty Board |
2001-03-01 | 2003-10-31 | Senate | Associate Dean of each Faculty | |
1991-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Medicine Faculty Board |
1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | University Health Services Committee | A member of a Clinical Department of the Faculty of Medicine, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
Are You Missing Publications, Invited Lectures? Click Me.