Name Card
Professor Leung, Katherine Chiu Man 梁超敏
Title:
Clinical Associate Professor
Associate Dean, Faculty of Dentistry
Faculty:
Supervision of Research Postgraduate Students
HKU Committee Appointments
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2013-10-01 | 2016-09-30 | University Admissions Committee | The Chairman of each Faculty Admissions Committee or his representative | |
1997-01-02 | 1997-06-30 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | Lecturers in Faculty | |
1998-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | Lecturers in Faculty | |
2001-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | Lecturers in Faculty | |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | Lecturers in Faculty | |
2008-07-01 | 2009-03-31 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2014-05-03 | 2016-05-02 | Discontinuation, Committee on | 1 member from each Faculty (Dentistry) from a panel of three in order of precedence for a period of 2 years, renewable up to a maximum of 4 consecutive years | Dentistry Faculty Board |
2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | Discontinuation, Committee on | 1 member from each Faculty (Dentistry) from a panel of three in order of precedence for a period of 2 years, renewable up to a maximum of 4 consecutive years | Dentistry Faculty Board |
2004-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | Lecturers in Faculty | |
2009-04-01 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | ||
2005-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University |
Are You Missing Publications, Invited Lectures? Click Me.