Samaranayake, LP
Name Card
Emeritus Professor Samaranayake, Lakshman Perera 西門雅慨
Department:
Faculty:
Supervision of Research Postgraduate Students
Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
Characterization of Candida albicans Biofilms: Their Formation, Anti-fungal Resistance, and Differentiation | Oral Microbiology | 2001 Phd Jin Ye | |
The Impact of the oral environment on Candida Biofilm Development | Oral Microbiology | 2003 Phd Zaw-Moe-Thein | |
In vitro studies on Candida, antimycotics and oral defences | Oral Microbiology | 1999 Phd Anil Sukumaran | |
Phylogenetic Aspects of Oral Bacterial Microbiome | Oral Bio-sciences | 2006 Phd Parahitiyawa Nipuna Bandara | |
Role of periodontal diseases in bisphosphonate-related osteonecrosis of the jaws | Oral Medicine | 2010 Phd Li Chunlei | |
Genotyping Candida species and molecular analysis of C. albicans gene encoding Mevalonate Pyrophosphate Decarboxylase | Oral Microbiology | 1997 Phd Dassanayake Ranil Samantha | |
The Bacterial and Yeast Flora of Root Surface Caries in Elderly Chinese: Clinical and in vitro Studies | Oral Microbiology | 1999 Phd Shen Song | |
Epstein - barr virus shedding and cytokine alterations in the oropharynx during HIV-1 infection | Oral Microbiology | 2007 Phd Perera Ranawaka Arachchige Prasad M. | |
Assessment of cell sheet constructs with periodontal alignment stem cells and endothelial cells for periodontal regeneration | Tissue engineering | 2011 Phd Panduwawala Kankanamalage Chamila Prageeth Pandula | |
Ultrastructural, histochemical and molecular features of the invasive phase of Candida species | Oral Microbiology | 2002 Phd Jayatilake Jayalath A.M. Sumedha | |
Molecular Microbiology of Candida Biofilms | Oral Microbiology | 2006 Phd Athukorala Arachchi Seneviratne C. J. | |
Predominant cultivable putative pathogens in Chinese adults with and without periodontal diseases | Periodontal Microbiology | 1996 Phd Lee Dae Hyun | |
Expression and regulation of human ß-defensins in gingival epithelia | Periodontology | 2001 Phd Lu Qian | |
Communal interactions of Candida and bacteria in mixed species biofilms | Oral Microbiology | 2008 Phd Bandara Hennaka Mudiyanselage Herath Nihal | |
A Novel Antifungal for Candida Infections: its in vitro and in vivo efficacy and Proposed Mechanism of Action | Oral Microbiology | 2011 Phd Wong Sze Wah Sarah | |
The Post-antifungal Effect (PAFE) and its Impact on the Pathogenic Attributes of Candida albicans | Oral Microbiology | 1996 Phd Ellepola Arjuna Nishantha Bandara | |
Pathogenic features of Candida parapsilosis - an emerging fungal pathogen | Oral Microbiology | 1996 Phd Panagoda Gehan Joseph | |
Molecular and Phenotypic Characteristics of the Genus Actinomyces with particular reference to the human oral cavity | cariobiology and oral microbiology | 2000 Phd Tang Gaoyan |
HKU Committee Appointments
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | Academic Board | Four teachers appointed by the Senate for a term of two years, with membership staggered at one-yearly intervals | |
1993-01-01 | 1995-05-14 | Senate | 2 teachers from each Faculty being members of the Board of that Faculty and not being Professors or the Heads of Teaching Departments, who shall be elected by the non-professorial members of the Board | Dentistry Faculty Board |
2004-10-29 | 2005-02-24 | Environmental Health and Safety Committee | Two teachers, appointed by the Senate (Chairman and Vice-Chairman) | Senate |
2005-01-01 | 2005-06-30 | Selection of Professional and Administrative Staff, Committee for the | A member of the University Selection and Promotion Committee, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | BAPR |
2005-06-01 | 2013-12-31 | Safety Health and Environment Committee | One Dean of Faculty, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor. | |
2004-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | Senate | Dean of each Faculty | |
2009-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | Senate | Dean of each Faculty | |
2004-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1997-07-01 | 2005-06-21 | Appointment of Professors and Readers, Board for the | The Professors, provided that Emeritus Professors, Honorary Professors and part-time professors shall not be members under this category | |
2004-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | Court Life Membership Committee | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2009-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | Court Life Membership Committee | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2004-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | Dean | |
2009-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | Dean | |
2010-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | University Research Committee | Up to six teachers appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Senate |
2004-01-01 | 2005-06-21 | Appointment of Professors and Readers, Board for the | Dean of each Faculty | |
2005-06-02 | 2008-06-01 | Honorary Degrees Committee | 3 Deans of Faculties, elected by the Senate | Senate |
2010-05-21 | 2013-05-20 | Honorary Degrees Committee | 3 Deans of Faculties, elected by the Senate | Senate |
2004-01-01 | 2005-09-27 | General Purposes Committee | The Dean of each Faculty | |
1991-06-01 | 1997-06-30 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | Readers in Faculty | |
1999-01-11 | 2000-11-01 | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | Dentistry Faculty Board |
1998-09-24 | 2000-08-31 | Board of Graduate Studies | Three teachers appointed by the Senate from different Faculties for two years at a time amongst the following academic groupings:(a) Dent/Medicine(b) Engg/Science/Arch(c) Arts/Bus & Econ/Social Sciences/Education/Law | |
2000-09-01 | 2002-08-31 | Board of Graduate Studies | Three teachers appointed by the Senate from different Faculties for two years at a time amongst the following academic groupings:(a) Dent/Medicine(b) Engg/Science/Arch(c) Arts/Bus & Econ/Social Sciences/Education/Law | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2004-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | Research and Conference Grants, Committee on | The Dean or Associate Dean of each Faculty, or their nominees | |
2009-01-01 | 2012-05-02 | Research and Conference Grants, Committee on | The Dean or Associate Dean of each Faculty, or their nominees | |
2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | Environmental Health and Safety Committee | Two members of the Senate, who are not students, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
2002-07-01 | 2004-02-24 | Environmental Health and Safety Committee | Two members of the Senate, who are not students, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
1996-01-01 | 1996-12-31 | Selection of Senior Teachers, Committee for the | One teacher of the relevant Faculty Board, elected by the Board, for a period of twelve months | Dentistry Faculty Board |
2001-09-25 | 2003-06-30 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | Five Heads (or representatives) of major user departments, appointed by the Committee for two years at a time | |
2004-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | Cognitive Science, Board of Studies in | The Deans of the Faculties or their nominees, contributing to the teaching of the degree programme | |
2009-01-01 | 2009-04-05 | Cognitive Science, Board of Studies in | The Deans of the Faculties or their nominees, contributing to the teaching of the degree programme | |
2005-09-10 | 2007-09-09 | Budget and Resources Committee | One Dean of a Faculty, elected from among its own number | |
2007-09-10 | 2009-09-09 | Budget and Resources Committee | One Dean of a Faculty, elected from among its own number | |
1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | Research and Conference Grants, Committee on | One other member (not being the Dean or Associate Dean) of each Faculty Board appointed by the Board | Dentistry Faculty Board |
2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | Enquiry into Possible Good Cause, Committee of | A panel of 12 members of the Senate who are teachers, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2004-02-25 | 2004-06-30 | Environmental Health and Safety Committee | Two teachers, at least one of whom shall be a member of the Senate, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | One teacher of the University, who is a registered user, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Senate |
1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | One teacher of the University, who is a registered user, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Senate |
1995-05-15 | 1997-02-25 | Senate | Associate Dean of each Faculty | |
1999-12-08 | 2001-12-07 | Senate | Associate Dean of each Faculty | |
2001-12-08 | 2002-06-30 | Senate | Associate Dean of each Faculty | |
2002-07-01 | 2002-12-31 | Senate | Associate Dean of each Faculty | |
2003-01-01 | 2003-10-31 | Senate | Associate Dean of each Faculty | |
2005-11-11 | 2008-12-31 | Senior Management Team and the Deans, Committee of the | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2009-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | Senior Management Team and the Deans, Committee of the | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2004-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | Committees Review Committee | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2009-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | Committees Review Committee | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2004-01-01 | 2004-01-27 | Selection of Heads of Teaching Departments, Committee for the | The Dean of the relevant Faculty | |
2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | Board of Graduate Studies | Three teachers appointed by the Senate from different Faculties for two years at a time amongst the following academic groupings:(a) Dent/Medicine(b) Engg/Science/Arch(c) Arts/Bus & Econ/Social Sciences/Education/Law | Senate |
2003-07-01 | 2004-12-31 | Selection of Senior Teachers, Committee for the | 3 Professors:1 from the following groups of Faculty A: Dentistry/Medicine B: Engineering/Science/Architecture C: Arts/Bus & Econ/Education/Law/Soc Sci | BAPR |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
1998-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | Environmental Health and Safety Committee | Two members of the Senate, who are not students, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
1998-12-08 | 1999-12-07 | Senate | Associate Dean of each Faculty | |
1997-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | Senate | Professors | |
1998-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | Selection of Senior Teachers, Committee for the | One teacher of the relevant Faculty Board, elected by the Board, for a period of twelve months | Dentistry Faculty Board |
1997-07-01 | 2013-12-31 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University |
Are You Missing Publications, Invited Lectures? Click Me.