1 representative each from the Fac of Dentistry, Engineering, Medicine & Science, appointed by the respective Bd of Fac (mbr should also preferably be mbr of a programme cmt that may be set up by the Bd of the Fac of Science on courses taught by the Unit) | Radiological Protection and Service Committee of Management | Science Faculty Board | | 1995-06-30 | | | 1997-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | |
|
1 representative each from the Fac of Dentistry, Engineering, Medicine & Science, appointed by the respective Bd of Fac (mbr should also preferably be mbr of a programme cmt that may be set up by the Bd of the Fac of Science on courses taught by the Unit) | Radiological Protection and Service Committee of Management | Dentistry Faculty Board | | 1996-02-14 | | Dr Li Ka Lun Thomas | 1996-02-15 | 1998-02-14 | | Dr Li Ka Lun Thomas |
|
The Dean of the Faculty of Science | Radiological Protection and Service Committee of Management | | 1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai | 1994-01-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai | 1991-01-01 | 1993-12-31 | | Professor Hodgkiss Ivor John |
|
Secretary | Radiological Protection and Service Committee of Management | | 1992-11-04 | 1995-08-31 | | Mr Cruddas John Wilfred | 1995-09-01 | 1997-05-31 | | Mr Lai Stephen King Kay | 1997-06-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Ms Brodie Kaye Elizabeth |
|
The Safety Officer | Radiological Protection and Service Committee of Management | | 1988-03-07 | 1998-12-31 | | Dr Mabbott Derek John |
|
Director of the Unit (The University Radiological Protection Officer (URPO) should also be a member if the Director is not at the same time URPO) | Radiological Protection and Service Committee of Management | | 1989-02-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Dr Tso Marianne Man Yin |
|
1 representative each from the Fac of Dentistry, Engineering, Medicine & Science, appointed by the respective Bd of Fac (mbr should also preferably be mbr of a programme cmt that may be set up by the Bd of the Fac of Science on courses taught by the Unit) | Radiological Protection and Service Committee of Management | Engineering Faculty Board | 1992-07-01 | 1996-02-05 | | Dr Yeung Ray Man Kit | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
|
Vice-Chairman (Members of the Senate, appointed by the Council for two years at a time) | Radiological Protection and Service Committee of Management | Council | 1992-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Fung Peter Chin Wan | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Sham Jonathan Shun Tong | 1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Sham Jonathan Shun Tong | 1994-12-22 | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Tong David Shuk Yin |
|
Vice-Chancellor | Radiological Protection and Service Committee of Management | | 1996-03-14 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 1987-07-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
Chairman (Members of the Senate, appointed by the Council for two years at a time) | Radiological Protection and Service Committee of Management | Council | 1991-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Ngan Henry | 1995-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Tong David Shuk Yin |
|
1 representative each from the Fac of Dentistry, Engineering, Medicine & Science, appointed by the respective Bd of Fac (mbr should also preferably be mbr of a programme cmt that may be set up by the Bd of the Fac of Science on courses taught by the Unit) | Radiological Protection and Service Committee of Management | Medicine Faculty Board | 1996-03-28 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Peh Wilfred Chin Guan | 1994-10-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Sham Jonathan Shun Tong |
|
Head, Department of Music | Rayson Huang Endowment Fund Committee of Management | | 1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1996-12-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2000-07-23 | | Dr Noone Michael John | 1994-03-07 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Marett Allan John |
|
Head, Department of Chemistry | Rayson Huang Endowment Fund Committee of Management | | 1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | | 1992-12-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Letcher Roy Melville |
|
Chairman (A Pro-V-C) | Rayson Huang Endowment Fund Committee of Management | President and Vice-Chancellor | | 1997-02-28 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1997-05-01 | 2000-04-30 | | | 1997-03-01 | 1997-04-30 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung |
|
Secretary | Rayson Huang Endowment Fund Committee of Management | | 1994-09-15 | 1997-05-31 | | Miss Wong Vivian Tee Vee | 1997-06-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Ms Chan Cordelia | | 1994-09-14 | | Ms Tang Liza Meng |
|
One other member (not being the Dean or Associate Dean) of each Faculty Board appointed by the Board | Research and Conference Grants, Committee on | Arts Faculty Board | 1999-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Noone Michael John | 1997-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Dr Noone Michael John | 1995-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | | 2001-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2001-01-01 | 2001-06-30 | | | 1991-07-01 | 1993-06-30 | | Professor Lui Yuen Chung Adam | 1993-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Skeldon Ronald |
|
One other member (not being the Dean or Associate Dean) of each Faculty Board appointed by the Board | Research and Conference Grants, Committee on | Law Faculty Board | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Dr Heilbronn Gary Neil | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 2002-01-01 | 2003-08-31 | | Professor Mushkat Roda | 2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Professor Smart Philip St John |
|
The Vice-Chancellor | Research and Conference Grants, Committee on | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2007-09-01 | 2012-05-02 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1986-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
A full-time teacher whose primary appointment is in an independent sub-division of studies and learning, to be appointed by the Senate | Research and Conference Grants, Committee on | Senate | 1995-09-29 | 2007-09-15 | | Professor Nunan David Charles |
|
One other member (not being the Dean or Associate Dean) of each Faculty Board appointed by the Board | Research and Conference Grants, Committee on | Science Faculty Board | 1992-10-23 | 1994-06-30 | | | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Dickman Michael David | 1998-07-01 | 1999-12-31 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 2002-01-01 | 2003-12-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2001-12-31 | | |
|