Librarian | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | | | 1997-03-31 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing | 1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing | 1997-04-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing |
|
The Chairman of the Library Committee | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | | 1997-09-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1996-09-01 | 1997-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1995-09-01 | 1996-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1993-09-01 | 1995-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | | 1994-03-31 | | | 1998-04-01 | 2000-03-31 | | | | 1993-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse |
|
The Vice-Chancellor, or his nominee (Chairman) | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | President and Vice-Chancellor | 1997-09-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1996-03-14 | 1997-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1998-04-01 | 1998-12-31 | | |
|
The Vice-Chancellor, or his nominee (Chairman) | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | | | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
A teacher, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | Senate | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Chan Kai Yuen | 1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Siu Man Keung |
|
Secretary | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | | 1995-04-15 | 1998-08-17 | | Mr Lai Chak Kong | 1992-11-16 | 1995-04-14 | | Ms Tang Violet Wai Chu | 1998-08-18 | 1998-12-31 | | Ms Yu Lisa Wei Man |
|
Two members from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | Senate | 2012-03-01 | 2014-02-28 | | | 2010-03-01 | 2012-02-29 | | | 2008-03-01 | 2010-02-28 | | | 2004-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2002-01-01 | 2003-12-31 | | | 2014-12-01 | 2016-11-30 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2014-11-30 | | | 2010-11-23 | 2012-11-30 | | | 1998-07-01 | 1999-12-06 | | | 1996-04-19 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1996-04-19 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Foo Pik Yue | 1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | | 2008-04-15 | 2010-01-23 | | Dr Ngai Kanya | 2008-09-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2006-10-04 | 2008-08-31 | | | 1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Dr Tang Endarra Lai King | 2016-07-01 | 2017-08-20 | | | 2014-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2007-11-21 | 2009-08-24 | | | 2005-11-21 | 2007-11-20 | | | 2007-09-20 | 2008-02-28 | | Dr Wong Wing San Grace Josephine | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 2022-12-22 | | | | 2019-03-04 | 2020-11-30 | | | 2016-12-01 | 2018-11-30 | | | 2014-12-02 | 2016-11-30 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2004-02-26 | | Professor Chi Iris | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | Professor Chi Iris | 1998-11-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Chi Iris | 1999-12-07 | 2001-12-31 | | | 2010-03-24 | 2012-03-23 | | | 2024-09-03 | | | | 2022-04-07 | 2024-04-06 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 2006-09-01 | 2007-06-30 | | Professor Sullivan Patricia Lynn | 2004-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | Professor Sullivan Patricia Lynn | 2002-12-27 | 2004-08-31 | | Professor Sullivan Patricia Lynn | 2019-10-22 | 2021-10-21 | | | 2016-12-01 | 2018-11-30 | | | 2014-12-01 | 2016-11-30 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2014-11-30 | | | 2010-11-23 | 2012-11-30 | | | 2006-03-10 | 2008-03-09 | | |
|
The Director of Counselling and Person Enrichment | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | | 2002-11-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2024-08-30 | | Dr Yeung Linda Lai Ying | 2009-10-03 | 2009-12-31 | | Mr Chong Chan Yau | 2006-10-03 | 2009-10-02 | | Mr Chong Chan Yau | 2001-07-01 | 2002-10-31 | | Mrs Miu Lee Peggy Roberta | 1985-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Ms Wong Ada Man Pui |
|
Secretary | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | | 2005-08-01 | 2007-01-10 | | Miss Fong Chung Yan | 1998-11-04 | 2005-07-31 | | Ms Chan Cordelia | 2007-01-11 | 2022-01-31 | | Ms Fung Enid Yin Chiu | 1994-02-07 | 1998-08-05 | | Ms Mak Ivy Suet Mui | 1993-02-07 | 1994-02-06 | | Ms Wan Katherine | 2022-02-10 | | | Ms Yeung Wing Yan |
|
A Warden or Senior Tutor as nominated by Wardens of Residential Halls | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | | 2010-06-13 | 2011-08-31 | | Dr Chu Siu Man | 2009-07-01 | 2010-06-12 | | Dr Chu Siu Man |
|
A Deputy Master or Senior Tutor of the Residential Colleges as nominated by the Masters | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | Senate | 2005-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | Mr Wang Ke |
|
Vice-Chairperson appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | Senate | 2017-08-25 | 2019-08-24 | | | 2015-09-07 | 2017-08-24 | | | 2013-08-25 | 2015-08-24 | | | 2011-08-25 | 2013-08-24 | | | 2009-08-25 | 2011-08-24 | | | 1991-02-08 | 1996-06-30 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kao Henry Shang Ren | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kao Henry Shang Ren | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kao Henry Shang Ren | 2008-01-01 | 2009-03-25 | | | 2006-01-01 | 2007-12-31 | | | 2004-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2002-01-21 | 2003-12-31 | | | 2023-10-22 | | | | 2022-01-12 | 2023-10-21 | | | 2019-10-22 | 2021-10-21 | | |
|
A Warden or Senior Tutor as nominated by Wardens of Residential Halls | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | Wardens of Halls | 2011-09-01 | 2013-08-31 | | Dr Chu Siu Man | 2007-09-10 | 2009-06-30 | | Dr Chu Siu Man | 2004-01-01 | 2006-04-30 | | Dr Law Helen Ka Wai | 2002-07-01 | 2003-12-31 | | Dr Law Helen Ka Wai | 2015-12-30 | 2017-08-31 | | Dr Yung Kevin Wai Ho | 2013-09-01 | 2015-08-31 | | Dr Yung Kevin Wai Ho | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Mrs Li Sin Jenny Lai Wah | 1996-06-27 | 1998-06-30 | | Mrs Li Sin Jenny Lai Wah |
|
Not more than two representatives of the Student Development Section as nominated by the Dean of Student Affairs | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | | 2012-08-28 | 2017-08-31 | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin | 2009-08-28 | 2012-08-27 | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin | 2006-10-03 | 2009-08-27 | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin | 2020-10-15 | 2021-10-14 | | | 2018-08-20 | 2019-08-31 | | Miss Leung Sin Man Ada | 2018-08-20 | 2019-08-31 | | Ms Fok Michele Chi Fung | 2021-01-01 | 2021-12-31 | | | 2021-01-01 | 2021-12-31 | | |
|
Chairperson (Dean of Student Affairs) | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | | 2013-04-01 | 2015-12-31 | | | 2008-04-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2005-04-01 | 2008-03-31 | | | 2016-01-01 | 2020-08-31 | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin | 2003-12-01 | 2004-10-17 | | Dr Powell Ellis John | 2000-12-01 | 2003-11-30 | | Dr Powell Ellis John | 1999-10-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1999-07-01 | 1999-09-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1999-01-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1998-04-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1997-10-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1997-07-01 | 1997-09-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1984-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Mr Brandon William Peter John | 2004-10-18 | 2005-03-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2000-11-30 | | | 2020-09-01 | | | |
|
Two members from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | | 2020-12-15 | 2022-11-30 | | | 2017-11-14 | 2019-09-30 | | |
|
The two Senate members of the General Purposes Committee | Personnel Matters, Committee on | | 2002-09-01 | 2004-02-24 | | | 2000-11-23 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1992-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Lye Kum Chew | 1995-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Walker Anthony | | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Chen Edward Kwan Yiu | 2001-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | |
|
A Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Council (Chairman) | Personnel Matters, Committee on | Council | 2000-11-13 | 2001-09-30 | | | 1998-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1997-07-01 | 1997-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1992-07-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2001-10-01 | 2004-02-24 | | | 1997-01-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1996-01-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse |
|
Vice-Chancellor | Personnel Matters, Committee on | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2002-09-01 | 2004-02-24 | | | | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
Four teachers, of whom two shall be members of the Senate elected by the Senate, and two appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | Personnel Matters, Committee on | | 2005-01-01 | 2007-12-31 | | | 2011-01-06 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2011-01-06 | 2013-01-21 | | | 2004-12-09 | 2007-12-08 | | | 2005-02-01 | 2007-12-31 | | |
|