President and Vice-Chancellor | Nominations Committee | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2004-01-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
Secretary (The Registrar) | Nominations Committee | | 2004-01-01 | 2020-06-30 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2020-07-01 | 2023-08-31 | | Ms Tsang Jeannie Wing Shi | 2023-09-01 | 2024-06-30 | | Ms Yue Dora Kar Man | 2024-07-01 | | | |
|
One University staff member of the Council (save the President & Vice-Chancellor who is already a member of the Committee), elected by staff and student members of the Council for a period of 2 years | Nominations Committee | Council | 2009-01-01 | 2009-12-04 | | | 2007-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | | | 2018-10-03 | 2018-11-19 | | | 2022-12-28 | | | | 2020-12-28 | 2022-12-27 | | | 2018-12-28 | 2020-12-27 | | | 2016-01-27 | 2017-09-28 | | | 2017-09-29 | 2018-08-19 | | | 2011-12-23 | 2012-12-08 | | | 2009-12-23 | 2011-12-22 | | | 2005-12-18 | 2006-12-31 | | | 2003-12-18 | 2005-12-17 | | | 2015-01-30 | 2015-11-19 | | | 2013-01-30 | 2015-01-29 | | |
|
Six teachers from Faculties other than the Faculty of Arts, appointed by the Senate. | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | Senate | 1996-07-01 | 1997-12-31 | | Dr Greene George William | 1994-03-03 | 1996-06-30 | | Dr Greene George William | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1994-03-03 | 1996-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Mr Chiu Edward Kai Chiu | 1994-03-03 | 1996-06-30 | | Mr Chiu Edward Kai Chiu | 1996-07-01 | 1997-01-05 | | Mr Rhodes Peter Frederick | 1994-03-03 | 1996-06-30 | | Mr Rhodes Peter Frederick | 1997-01-06 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Chan Kai Yuen | 1994-03-03 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Chan Kai Yuen | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1994-03-03 | 1996-06-30 | | |
|
The Dean of the Faculty of Arts or a representative appointed by the Dean | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | | 1996-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1994-04-24 | 1996-06-30 | | |
|
The Director of the School of Research Studies or a representative appointed by the Director | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | | 1997-05-01 | 1998-08-31 | | | 1996-01-01 | 1997-03-31 | | Professor Weatherhead Brian |
|
Four members from each of the language groups of Chinese, Japanese, Germanic and Romance languages | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | | 1994-05-16 | 1998-12-31 | | | 1994-06-01 | 1997-05-31 | | Dr Meyer Denis Charles | 1994-05-16 | 1998-12-31 | | | 1994-06-01 | 1997-05-31 | | Mr Urbanski Paul Heinz |
|
A teacher appointed by the Senate (Chairman) | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | Senate | 1994-04-06 | 1996-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Fletcher Paul Jeffrey |
|
Secretary | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | | 1993-12-14 | 1995-01-15 | | Mrs Kwan Julita Yuk Kwan | 1998-07-06 | 1998-12-31 | | Mrs Tsang Renee Kwai Ling | 1995-01-16 | 1998-07-05 | | Ms Tang Violet Wai Chu |
|
The Head of each teaching department and unit offering non-degree language courses (other than English enhancement and courses offered in the SPACE) | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | | 1997-01-01 | 1998-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 1994-05-16 | 1996-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 1995-09-15 | 1996-12-31 | | | 1994-05-16 | 1995-09-14 | | Professor Moeran Brian Dermot | 1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Refsing Kirsten | 1998-09-01 | 1998-12-31 | | |
|
Librarian | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | | | 1997-03-31 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing | 1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing | 1997-04-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing |
|
The Chairman of the Library Committee | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | | 1997-09-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1996-09-01 | 1997-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1995-09-01 | 1996-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1993-09-01 | 1995-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | | 1994-03-31 | | | 1998-04-01 | 2000-03-31 | | | | 1993-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse |
|
The Vice-Chancellor, or his nominee (Chairman) | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | President and Vice-Chancellor | 1997-09-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1996-03-14 | 1997-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1998-04-01 | 1998-12-31 | | |
|
The Vice-Chancellor, or his nominee (Chairman) | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | | | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
A teacher, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | Senate | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Chan Kai Yuen | 1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Siu Man Keung |
|
Secretary | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | | 1995-04-15 | 1998-08-17 | | Mr Lai Chak Kong | 1992-11-16 | 1995-04-14 | | Ms Tang Violet Wai Chu | 1998-08-18 | 1998-12-31 | | Ms Yu Lisa Wei Man |
|
Two members from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | Senate | 2012-03-01 | 2014-02-28 | | | 2010-03-01 | 2012-02-29 | | | 2008-03-01 | 2010-02-28 | | | 2004-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2002-01-01 | 2003-12-31 | | | 2014-12-01 | 2016-11-30 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2014-11-30 | | | 2010-11-23 | 2012-11-30 | | | 1998-07-01 | 1999-12-06 | | | 1996-04-19 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1996-04-19 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Foo Pik Yue | 1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | | 2008-04-15 | 2010-01-23 | | Dr Ngai Kanya | 2008-09-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2006-10-04 | 2008-08-31 | | | 1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Dr Tang Endarra Lai King | 2016-07-01 | 2017-08-20 | | | 2014-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2007-11-21 | 2009-08-24 | | | 2005-11-21 | 2007-11-20 | | | 2007-09-20 | 2008-02-28 | | Dr Wong Wing San Grace Josephine | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 2022-12-22 | | | | 2019-03-04 | 2020-11-30 | | | 2016-12-01 | 2018-11-30 | | | 2014-12-02 | 2016-11-30 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2004-02-26 | | Professor Chi Iris | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | Professor Chi Iris | 1998-11-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Chi Iris | 1999-12-07 | 2001-12-31 | | | 2010-03-24 | 2012-03-23 | | | 2024-09-03 | | | | 2022-04-07 | 2024-04-06 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 2006-09-01 | 2007-06-30 | | Professor Sullivan Patricia Lynn | 2004-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | Professor Sullivan Patricia Lynn | 2002-12-27 | 2004-08-31 | | Professor Sullivan Patricia Lynn | 2019-10-22 | 2021-10-21 | | | 2016-12-01 | 2018-11-30 | | | 2014-12-01 | 2016-11-30 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2014-11-30 | | | 2010-11-23 | 2012-11-30 | | | 2006-03-10 | 2008-03-09 | | |
|
The Director of Counselling and Person Enrichment | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | | 2002-11-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2024-08-30 | | Dr Yeung Linda Lai Ying | 2009-10-03 | 2009-12-31 | | Mr Chong Chan Yau | 2006-10-03 | 2009-10-02 | | Mr Chong Chan Yau | 2001-07-01 | 2002-10-31 | | Mrs Miu Lee Peggy Roberta | 1985-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Ms Wong Ada Man Pui |
|
Secretary | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | | 2005-08-01 | 2007-01-10 | | Miss Fong Chung Yan | 1998-11-04 | 2005-07-31 | | Ms Chan Cordelia | 2007-01-11 | 2022-01-31 | | Ms Fung Enid Yin Chiu | 1994-02-07 | 1998-08-05 | | Ms Mak Ivy Suet Mui | 1993-02-07 | 1994-02-06 | | Ms Wan Katherine | 2022-02-10 | | | Ms Yeung Wing Yan |
|
A Warden or Senior Tutor as nominated by Wardens of Residential Halls | Personal Development and Counselling, Committee on | | 2010-06-13 | 2011-08-31 | | Dr Chu Siu Man | 2009-07-01 | 2010-06-12 | | Dr Chu Siu Man |
|