Secretary | Kadoorie Agricultural Research Centre Committee of Management | | 1996-10-30 | 1996-10-31 | | Mrs Hill Alice Nyuk Foon | 2005-09-05 | 2008-12-04 | | Mrs Tsang Tse Angela Oi Man | 1996-11-01 | 2005-08-07 | | Ms Brodie Kaye Elizabeth |
|
Vice-Chancellor | Kadoorie Agricultural Research Centre Committee of Management | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2007-09-01 | 2008-12-04 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1986-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
Three teachers appointed by the Senate, at least one of whom shall be a Centre Fellow. | Kadoorie Agricultural Research Centre Committee of Management | Senate | 2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2001-05-07 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2001-05-07 | 2003-06-30 | | | 1998-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Dr Yu Kei Li | 1991-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Barnes Ian Ernest | 1992-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Professor Cowan Richard | 1992-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Professor Hodgkiss Ivor John | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Zee Shane Sze Yong | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Zee Shane Sze Yong | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Zee Shane Sze Yong |
|
The Director of the Centre | Kadoorie Agricultural Research Centre Committee of Management | | 2002-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Daniel Kwong On | 2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Daniel Kwong On | 1990-08-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Daniel Kwong On | 2006-01-01 | 2008-12-04 | | |
|
Chairman (a member of the Senate appointed by the Senate) | Kadoorie Agricultural Research Centre Committee of Management | Senate | 2007-09-01 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2005-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2003-09-01 | 2005-08-31 | | | 2001-09-01 | 2003-08-31 | | | 1999-09-01 | 2001-08-31 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1999-08-31 | | | | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Weatherhead Brian |
|
Secretary | Language Policy Committee | | 2005-07-05 | 2009-06-02 | | Mrs Hui Tania M |
|
Vice-Chancellor, or Deputy Vice-Chancellor, or a Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman). | Language Policy Committee | | |
Four teachers, who should not be members of the language learning providers, appointed by the Senate for a period of two years. | Language Policy Committee | Senate | 2007-09-09 | 2009-06-02 | | | 2005-09-09 | 2007-09-08 | | | 2007-09-09 | 2009-06-02 | | | 2005-09-09 | 2007-09-08 | | | 2007-09-09 | 2009-06-02 | | | 2005-09-09 | 2007-09-08 | | | 2007-09-09 | 2009-06-02 | | | 2005-09-09 | 2007-09-08 | | |
|
Vice-Chancellor | Language Resources Co-ordinating Committee | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 1994-10-04 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
Director, English Centre | Language Resources Co-ordinating Committee | | 1994-10-04 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Nunan David Charles |
|
Director, Language Centre | Language Resources Co-ordinating Committee | | 1994-10-04 | 1995-06-30 | | Dr Fok Chan Angela Yuen Yuen | 1995-09-01 | 1998-12-31 | | |
|
Secretary | Language Resources Co-ordinating Committee | | 1994-10-04 | 1997-04-02 | | Mr Barry Michael Hall |
|
Head, Department of Chinese | Language Resources Co-ordinating Committee | | 1997-01-01 | 1998-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 1994-10-04 | 1996-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 1998-09-01 | 1998-12-31 | | |
|
Head, Department of Japanese Studies | Language Resources Co-ordinating Committee | | 1995-09-15 | 1996-12-31 | | | 1994-10-04 | 1995-09-14 | | Professor Moeran Brian Dermot | 1997-07-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Refsing Kirsten |
|
Officer in attendance | Language Resources Co-ordinating Committee | | 1994-10-04 | 1998-12-31 | | Dr Hart Ian Ernest | 1994-10-04 | 1998-12-31 | | Mr Joe Sing He |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Lau Wong Fat Urbanization Research Fund Committee of Management | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1986-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu | 2018-07-15 | 2023-07-14 | | |
|
Secretary | Lau Wong Fat Urbanization Research Fund Committee of Management | | 2006-09-26 | 2008-11-16 | | Miss Hui Ying Ying Jaco | 1996-02-07 | 2006-09-25 | | Miss Leung Equeen Yee Kwan | 2009-05-18 | | | Miss Ling Kay | 1994-09-15 | 1994-11-10 | | Mr Ng Eric Shu Pui | 1994-11-11 | 1996-02-06 | | Mrs Kwok Beckie Fung Yee |
|
Two members of the Department of Geography appointed by the Head of the School for two years at a time | Lau Wong Fat Urbanization Research Fund Committee of Management | Head of Dept. | 1994-09-26 | 1996-09-25 | | | 1992-09-27 | 1994-09-26 | | Dr Wang Liang Huew | 1994-09-26 | 1996-07-23 | | Ms Leung Wai Tung | 1992-09-27 | 1994-09-26 | | Ms Leung Wai Tung | 1996-09-26 | 1998-09-25 | | |
|
Head, Department of Geography (Chairman) | Lau Wong Fat Urbanization Research Fund Committee of Management | | 2009-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2003-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2011-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2001-01-02 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1998-01-02 | 2001-01-01 | | | 2020-11-01 | 2021-06-30 | | | 1988-07-01 | 1993-12-02 | | Professor Leung Chi Keung | 2006-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-12-31 | | | 2017-11-01 | 2020-10-31 | | | 1996-12-03 | 1998-01-01 | | Professor Sit Victor Fung Shuen | 1993-12-03 | 1996-12-02 | | Professor Sit Victor Fung Shuen | 2014-01-01 | 2016-12-31 | | |
|
A teacher appointed by the Senate who is not a member of the Department of Geography | Lau Wong Fat Urbanization Research Fund Committee of Management | Senate | 2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-09-18 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1989-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Lye Kum Chew | 1998-09-03 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Walker Anthony | 1995-07-01 | 1998-09-02 | | Emeritus Professor Walker Anthony |
|