Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Science Faculty Board | 2002-07-01 | 2002-12-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Dentistry Faculty Board | |
The Vice-Chancellor | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2007-09-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Education Faculty Board | 2000-09-26 | 2002-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2005-08-31 | | Professor Evers Colin William |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | School of Business | 1998-09-30 | 2003-06-30 | | Dr Wong Man Yuen |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Arts Faculty Board | |
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Law Faculty Board | 2002-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 1999-09-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Halkyard Andrew John |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Architecture Faculty Board | |
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Medicine Faculty Board | 2001-03-01 | 2003-10-12 | | | 1998-09-30 | 2001-02-28 | | |
|
Two teachers appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | | 2000-09-01 | 2002-01-10 | | | 1998-11-18 | 2000-08-31 | | | 2000-09-01 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam | 1998-09-29 | 2000-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam | 2009-07-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2009-07-22 | 2010-08-31 | | |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Careers Advisory Board | |
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Engineering Faculty Board | 1999-07-16 | 2001-06-30 | | | 2001-07-01 | 2003-08-21 | | |
|
Dean and Associate Deans of the Graduate School | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | | 2008-08-01 | 2009-07-31 | | | 2006-08-01 | 2008-07-31 | | | 2004-08-01 | 2006-07-31 | | | 2002-08-01 | 2004-07-31 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-07-31 | | | 2004-08-01 | 2006-07-31 | | | 2002-08-01 | 2004-07-31 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-07-31 | | | 2010-04-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2000-11-13 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1998-11-13 | 2000-11-12 | | | 2009-08-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2009-08-01 | 2010-03-31 | | | 2008-08-01 | 2009-07-31 | | | 2000-11-13 | 2002-01-28 | | Professor Tong Howell | 1998-11-13 | 2000-11-12 | | Professor Tong Howell | 2008-08-01 | 2009-07-31 | | | 2006-08-01 | 2008-07-31 | | | 2004-08-01 | 2006-07-31 | | | 2002-08-01 | 2004-07-31 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-07-31 | | | 2000-11-13 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1998-11-13 | 2000-11-12 | | | 2006-08-01 | 2008-07-31 | | |
|
Two teachers appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Senate | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2006-08-26 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2003-03-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence | 2004-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2004-04-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2002-03-19 | 2004-03-31 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2003-02-28 | | Professor Fletcher Paul Jeffrey |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Social Sciences Faculty Board | 2002-01-10 | 2003-07-31 | | | 1999-01-10 | 2002-01-09 | | |
|
Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | | 2009-07-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2003-09-17 | 2006-11-24 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2010-07-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2010-07-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2010-07-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2005-09-01 | 2007-12-18 | | Professor Davison Christine Mary | 2008-12-16 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2006-11-25 | 2008-12-15 | | | 2003-08-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2005-10-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2003-07-14 | 2005-09-30 | | | 2007-07-11 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2003-10-13 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2007-06-05 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2004-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2009-01-01 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2007-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | | | 2006-03-31 | 2006-12-31 | | | 2003-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-06-04 | | | 2003-08-22 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2010-07-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2007-12-19 | 2010-08-31 | | |
|
The Secretary | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | | 1998-09-30 | 2000-11-05 | | Mrs Ma Leung Wendy Oi Ling | 2007-09-01 | 2010-08-31 | | Mrs Tsui Yeung Betty Man Wai | 2000-11-06 | 2007-06-19 | | Ms Ho Aster Chung See | 2007-06-20 | 2007-08-31 | | Ms Mak Ivy Suet Mui |
|
Dean and Associate Deans of the Graduate School | Board of Graduate Studies | | 2008-08-01 | 2009-07-31 | | | 2006-08-01 | 2008-07-31 | | | 2004-08-01 | 2006-07-31 | | | 2002-08-01 | 2004-07-31 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-07-31 | | | 2004-08-01 | 2006-07-31 | | | 2002-08-01 | 2004-07-31 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-07-31 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2014-05-26 | | | 2012-04-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2010-04-01 | 2012-03-31 | | | 2000-11-13 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1998-11-13 | 2000-11-12 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2011-08-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2009-08-01 | 2011-07-31 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2010-09-30 | | | 2014-01-01 | 2014-05-26 | | | 2009-08-01 | 2010-03-31 | | | 2008-08-01 | 2009-07-31 | | | 2014-01-01 | 2014-05-26 | | | 2012-10-01 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2010-10-01 | 2012-09-30 | | | 2000-11-13 | 2002-01-28 | | Professor Tong Howell | 1998-11-13 | 2000-11-12 | | Professor Tong Howell | 2008-08-01 | 2009-07-31 | | | 2006-08-01 | 2008-07-31 | | | 2004-08-01 | 2006-07-31 | | | 2002-08-01 | 2004-07-31 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-07-31 | | | 2000-11-13 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1998-11-13 | 2000-11-12 | | | 2014-01-01 | 2014-05-26 | | | 2006-08-01 | 2008-07-31 | | |
|
Three teachers appointed by the Senate from different Faculties for two years at a time amongst the following academic groupings:(a) Dent/Medicine(b) Engg/Science/Arch(c) Arts/Bus & Econ/Social Sciences/Education/Law | Board of Graduate Studies | | 2000-09-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-09-24 | 2000-08-31 | | | 2000-09-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-11-18 | 2000-08-31 | | | 2000-09-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-09-24 | 2000-08-31 | | |
|
A research postgraduate student recommended by the Postgraduate Students Association and appointed by the Senate | Board of Graduate Studies | Senate | 2007-09-01 | 2008-08-31 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2005-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | |
|