The Deputy Director of the Institute or, failing the establishment of the post, one of the Principal Investigators of the Institute, nominated by the Director, appointed by the Senate | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | Senate | | 1993-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Tai Kwong | 1995-08-01 | 1998-12-03 | | |
|
One teacher, nominated by the Dean of Science, appointed by the Senate | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | Senate | | 1996-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
|
Vice-Chancellor | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
Director of the Institute | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | | 1990-01-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Kan Yuet Wai | 1998-12-04 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Kung Hsiang-fu |
|
A Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | President and Vice-Chancellor | | 1997-03-31 | | | 1998-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | | |
|
Two teachers from those disciplines in the University related most closely to the work of the Institute, appointed by the Senate | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | Senate | | 1996-06-30 | | | | 1994-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Kwan David Chiu Yin | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
|
One teacher, nominated by the Dean of Medicine, appointed by the Senate | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | Senate | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | | | 1994-06-30 | | Professor Yeung Desmond Chak Yew | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
|
Secretary | Institute of Molecular Biology Supervisory Board | | | 1994-10-03 | | Mr Lee Dominic Yeung Fan | 1994-10-04 | 2001-02-11 | | Mrs Tsang Amy Wai Chee | 2001-02-12 | 2005-07-11 | | Ms Tang Liza Meng |
|
Three teachers of the University appointed by the Senate, including one each from the Faculties of Medicine and Science | Institute of Molecular Biology Supervisory Board | Senate | | 1995-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Daniel Kwong On | 1994-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Tai Kwong | 1998-11-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-10-31 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2005-07-11 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-09-18 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-11-02 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon | 1995-07-01 | 1998-11-01 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon | | 1994-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Sir Todd David | 2004-09-01 | 2005-07-11 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-09-18 | 2002-08-31 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2005-07-11 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum | 2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum | 2000-09-18 | 2002-08-31 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum | | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Zee Shane Sze Yong | 1998-11-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Zee Shane Sze Yong | 1995-07-01 | 1998-10-31 | | Professor Zee Shane Sze Yong |
|
Vice-Chancellor | Institute of Molecular Biology Supervisory Board | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2002-09-01 | 2005-07-11 | | | | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
Director of the Institute | Institute of Molecular Biology Supervisory Board | | 1990-01-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Kan Yuet Wai | 2003-12-04 | 2004-12-03 | | Professor Kung Hsiang-fu | 1998-12-04 | 2003-12-03 | | Professor Kung Hsiang-fu |
|
Up to six teachers, at least two of whom shall be Senate members, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time. (Members shall come from different disciplines and shall preferably have knowledge of education systems in different geographical regions.) | International Collaboration, Committee on | Senate | | 1995-06-30 | | Dr Frankenstein John | 1995-07-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Dr Frankenstein John | | 1995-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Chwang Allen Tse Yung | 1995-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Chwang Allen Tse Yung | 1995-07-01 | 1996-12-16 | | Professor Joseph John Earl | | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Kwan David Chiu Yin | | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Lee Ngok | 1997-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 1997-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Will Barry Fegan | 1995-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Will Barry Fegan |
|
Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | International Collaboration, Committee on | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
A Vice-Chairman, the Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Academic) | International Collaboration, Committee on | | 1997-09-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1996-09-01 | 1997-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1993-06-01 | 1996-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1998-04-01 | 1998-12-31 | | |
|
A lay member of the Council, appointed by the Council | International Collaboration, Committee on | Council | | 1995-05-12 | | The Hon. Mr. Justice Litton Henry |
|
Officers in Attendance | International Collaboration, Committee on | | 1992-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Mr Chan Rupert Kwan Yun | 1992-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun |
|
Secretary | International Collaboration, Committee on | | 1993-09-01 | 1995-04-30 | | Mrs Kwan Julita Yuk Kwan | 1995-05-01 | 1996-01-23 | | Ms Tang Violet Wai Chu | 1996-01-24 | 1998-08-17 | | Ms Yu Lisa Wei Man |
|
One member of the University Research Committee appointed by the Committee | International Collaboration, Committee on | University Research Committee | | 1994-06-30 | | | 1995-05-10 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Tong David Shuk Yin |
|
One member of the University Research Committee appointed by the Committee | International Collaboration, Committee on | Council | |
Dean of Students | International Collaboration, Committee on | | 1999-01-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1998-04-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1997-10-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1997-07-01 | 1997-09-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | | 1997-06-30 | | Mr Brandon William Peter John |
|