Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
A Microstructural Study of Warm Rolled Interstitial Free Steel | Materials Science & Engineering | 2000 Phd Quadir Md Zakaria | |
Effects of Minor Alloying on the Microstructures and Creep Properties of RR2086 Superalloys | Material Science & Technology | 2001 Phd Kong Yonghua | |
A Transmission Electron Microscopy Study of the Development of Rolling Deformation Microstructures in an Interstitial Free Steel | TEM study, Microstructures, Texture | 1999 Phd Shen Kai |
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2001-07-01 | 2001-12-31 | Selection of Professional and Administrative Staff, Committee for the | A member of the University Selection and Promotion Committee, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | BAPR |
2002-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | Senate | Professors | |
1995-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | Appointment of Professors and Readers, Board for the | The Professors, provided that Emeritus Professors, Honorary Professors and part-time professors shall not be members under this category | |
2002-10-21 | 2003-06-30 | Appointment of Professors and Readers, Board for the | The Professors, provided that Emeritus Professors, Honorary Professors and part-time professors shall not be members under this category | |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | Appointment of Professors and Readers, Board for the | The Professors, provided that Emeritus Professors, Honorary Professors and part-time professors shall not be members under this category | |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | School of Research Studies, Committee on the | One teacher appointed by the Board of each Faculty and by the Board of Studies of the School of Business | Engineering Faculty Board |
1996-06-30 | School of Research Studies, Committee on the | One teacher appointed by the Board of each Faculty and by the Board of Studies of the School of Business | Engineering Faculty Board | |
1995-07-01 | 1999-11-30 | Higher Doctorates, Committee on | Three teachers appointed by the Senate for two years at a time, renewable up to a maximum of four consecutive years | Senate |
2000-10-07 | 2001-06-30 | Higher Doctorates, Committee on | Three teachers appointed by the Senate for two years at a time, renewable up to a maximum of four consecutive years | Senate |
1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | Three Specialist Advisers appointed by the Senate | Senate |
1994-04-21 | 1996-06-30 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | Three Specialist Advisers appointed by the Senate | Senate |
2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | Three Specialist Advisers appointed by the Senate | Senate |
2003-07-01 | 2005-12-31 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | Three Specialist Advisers appointed by the Senate | Senate |
1990-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Readers in Faculty | |
2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | Robert Black College Committee of Management | The Fellows: Two Members of the Senate, being teachers, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
2003-07-01 | 2004-02-24 | Robert Black College Committee of Management | The Fellows: Two Members of the Senate, being teachers, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
2001-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | Higher Doctorates, Committee on | The Chairman (The Chairman and Vice-Chairman (members of the Senate appointed for two years at a time)) | Senate |
2002-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Professor in Faculty | |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2003-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2000-01-01 | 2002-06-30 | University Engineering Advisory Committee | Members of the Engineering Curriculum Review and Development Committee of the Board of the Fac of Engineering (ie the Chairman, being the Associate Dean of the Fac of Eng, the Heads of Dept and 1 member appointed by each Head of Dept of the Fac of Eng). | |
1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | The Chairman and Vice-Chairman appointed by the Senate from among members | Senate |
1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | The Chairman and Vice-Chairman appointed by the Senate from among members | Senate |
1998-07-01 | 2001-08-31 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | The Chairman and Vice-Chairman appointed by the Senate from among members | Senate |
2001-09-01 | 2003-08-31 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | The Chairman and Vice-Chairman appointed by the Senate from among members | Senate |
2003-09-01 | 2005-12-31 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | The Chairman and Vice-Chairman appointed by the Senate from among members | Senate |
1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | Enquiry into Possible Good Cause, Committee of | A panel of 12 members of the Senate who are teachers, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
1992-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | Vice-Chairman | Senate |
2000-01-01 | 2001-06-30 | Selection of Senior Teachers, Committee for the | 3 Professors:1 from the following groups of Faculty A: Dentistry/Medicine B: Engineering/Science/Architecture C: Arts/Bus & Econ/Education/Law/Soc Sci | BAPR |
1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | Electronmicroscope Unit Committee of Management | Three Specialist Advisers appointed by the Senate | Senate |
1995-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | Senate | Professors | |
1995-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Professor in Faculty |