Name Card
Professor Chau, Patrick Yam Keung 周蔭強
Title:
Honorary Professor
Supervision of Research Postgraduate Students
Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
A transaction cost perspective of B2C e-commerce | Management of Accounting Information System | 2004 Phd Li Chung Man David | |
Can Creativity be Learned: A Knowledge Management Approach to Creativity Support | Knowledge Management and Customer Relationship Management | 2002 Phd Cheung Pak Keung | |
Information Security Deviant Behavior: Its Typology, Measures, and Causes. | MIS | 2009 Phd Chu Man Ying | |
Resource Complementarity of the Internet and its Role in Creating Sustained Competitive Advantage in Firms | MIS | 2004 Phd Chow Lo Sing Charles | |
The Impacts of Trust-Based Factors on the Effectivesness of Search Engine Advertising | Information Systems | 2007 Phd Lu Yan | |
Exploring the Effects of Relationship and Contract Issues on the Success of IT Outsourcing - An Exploratory Study in China | Management Information Systems | 2006 Phd Qi Cong | |
Multichannel Management in the Motion Picture Industry | Innovation and Information Management | 2012 Phd Yu Yinan | |
An Empirical Study of the Factors Affecting Individual Performance Using a Modified Task-Technology Fit Approach | Information System | 2001 MPhil Chun Yu Grace | |
Essays on Online Communities: The Motivation for and Value of Participation | Innovation and Information Management | 2013 Phd Cai Xiaofang | |
Online Auction Price Prediction: A Bayesian Updating Framework Based on the Feedback History | Information Systems | 2007 MPhil Yang Boye | |
Using Data Mining Techniques to Discover Customer Behavioral Patterns for Direct Marketing in Mobile Telecommunication Industry | E-business and Supply Chain Management | 2004 Phd Chen Xi | |
Essays on Information Perception of Online Reviews | Innovation and Information Management | 2013 Phd Bao Zhuolan | |
Consumers' Privacy Concern in the Emerging Online Markets | Innovation and Information Management | 2016 Phd Li Chenwei |
HKU Committee Appointments
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | 2016-03-31 | Graduate House Committee of Management | Two members of the Senate, being teachers, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
2012-04-01 | 2014-03-31 | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | 6 members from the University, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2014-04-01 | 2016-03-31 | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | 6 members from the University, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2016-04-01 | 2018-03-31 | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | 6 members from the University, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2013-04-01 | 2016-03-31 | Senate | 12 elected Professors (Group A) | |
2010-04-01 | 2013-03-31 | Senate | 12 elected Professors (Group A) | |
2011-04-07 | 2012-09-30 | Board of Studies for English Language Enhancement Programmes | A representative from each Faculty, nominated by the Dean of the Faculty for two years at a time | |
2009-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | Academic Awards, Board of | An Associate Dean (Undergraduate Education/Teaching and Learning), appointed on rotational basis for two years at a time, from Faculty Cluster B (Arts, Business & Economics, Education and Social Sciences) | |
2007-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | Academic Awards, Board of | An Associate Dean (Undergraduate Education/Teaching and Learning), appointed on rotational basis for two years at a time, from Faculty Cluster B (Arts, Business & Economics, Education and Social Sciences) | |
2016-07-14 | 2017-09-14 | BoS in Business Administration (Information Systems) and Engineering (Computer Science) | Three members from the Faculty of Business and Economics, including the Dean or his/her delegate, Programme Director and Deputy Programme Director of BBA(IS) | |
2010-11-16 | 2012-11-15 | BoS in Business Administration (Information Systems) and Engineering (Computer Science) | Three members from the Faculty of Business and Economics, including the Dean or his/her delegate, Programme Director and Deputy Programme Director of BBA(IS) | |
2013-07-14 | 2016-07-13 | BoS in Business Administration and Law | Three members from the Faculty of Business and Economics, including the Dean or his/her delegate, Programme Director and Deputy Programme Director of BBA(Law) | |
2016-07-14 | 2017-09-14 | BoS in Business Administration and Law | Three members from the Faculty of Business and Economics, including the Dean or his/her delegate, Programme Director and Deputy Programme Director of BBA(Law) | |
2001-09-01 | 2005-06-30 | BoS in Business Administration and Law | Three members from the Faculty of Business and Economics, including the Dean or his/her delegate, Programme Director and Deputy Programme Director of BBA(Law) | |
1999-09-01 | 2000-12-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Director of the School of Business, or his nominee | |
1999-05-05 | 2000-12-31 | School of Business, Board of Studies of the | The teachers who have been organized by the Senate into the School of Business and who are full-time employees of the University. | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2015-07-01 | 2016-03-31 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2011-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2011-09-01 | 2013-07-13 | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | |
2013-03-28 | 2015-03-27 | Higher Doctorates, Committee on | The Vice-Chairman (The Chairman and Vice-Chairman (members of the Senate appointed for two years at a time)) | Senate |
2015-03-28 | 2016-03-31 | Higher Doctorates, Committee on | The Vice-Chairman (The Chairman and Vice-Chairman (members of the Senate appointed for two years at a time)) | Senate |
2010-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | Enquiry into Possible Good Cause, Committee of | A panel of 12 members of the Senate who are teachers, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2002-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | Senate | Associate Dean of each Faculty | |
2001-08-01 | 2002-06-30 | Senate | Associate Dean of each Faculty | |
2013-07-14 | 2016-07-13 | BoS in Business Administration (Information Systems) and Engineering (Computer Science) | Three members from the Faculty of Business and Economics, including the Dean or his/her delegate, Programme Director and Deputy Programme Director of BBA(IS) | School of Business |
2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2001-01-01 | 2020-06-30 | Faculty of Business and Economics, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2018-04-01 | 2019-02-28 | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | 6 members from the University, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time |
Are You Missing Publications, Invited Lectures? Click Me.