Name Card
Mr Lee, Peter Kai Kwong 李啟光
Title:
Honorary Professor
Department:
Faculty:
Supervision of Research Postgraduate Students
Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
Analysis and prediction of the axial capacity and settlement of displacement piles in sandy soil | Geotechnical Engineering | 2005 MPhil Mu Feng | |
Termination Criteria for High-capacity Jacked and Driven Steel H-piles in Hong Kong | Geotechnical Engineering | 2002 Phd Lam Joley | |
Shock Vibration Resistance and Direct Tensile Strength of Concrete | Concrete technology | 1999 Phd Zheng Wei | |
STUDY OF ROCK JOINT ROUGHNESS USING 3D LASER SCANNING TECHNIQUE | Geotechnical Engineering | 2006 MPhil Tam Candy Chung Yan | |
The Use of Recycled Concrete in Construction | Structural Engineering | 2001 Phd Fung Wing Kun | |
Failure Characteristics of Hong Kong Granite: Laboratory Investigation and Numerical Simulation | Rock Mechanics | 1999 MPhil Yu Feng | |
A Study of Capacity Predictions for Driven Piles by Dynamic Pile Testing | Geotechnical Engineering | 2004 Phd Wong Man Kie | |
Time-Dependent Behaviour of Concrete Structures with Special Reference to Podium and Frame Structures | Structural Engineering | 2003 Phd Liu Chi Hong | |
Case studies on the stability of deep excavations | The practice and research in the deep excavation & its shoring | 1999 MPhil Luk Tat Fai | |
Behaviour of Large Capacity Jacked Piles | Geotechnical Engineering | 2001 Phd Yu Feng | |
Pilot Study on the Use of Public Fill in Seawall Foundations | Geotechnical Engineering | 2002 MPhil Mok Ka Ying | |
Experimental Study of A Modified Flat Dilatometer under Plane Strain Condition | Development of Field Testing Methods for Hong Kong Soils | 1995 Phd Udakara Deepthi De Silva |
HKU Committee Appointments
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2009-08-14 | 2011-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other persons not being teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate on the recommendation of the Board, provided that the number of such persons shall not exceed one-fourth of the whole number of members of the Board | |
2011-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other persons not being teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate on the recommendation of the Board, provided that the number of such persons shall not exceed one-fourth of the whole number of members of the Board | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other persons not being teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate on the recommendation of the Board, provided that the number of such persons shall not exceed one-fourth of the whole number of members of the Board | |
2001-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | Senate | Other Heads of Teaching Department | |
2001-01-02 | 2001-06-30 | Senate | Other Heads of Teaching Department | |
2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | Discontinuation, Committee on | 1 member from each Faculty (Engineering) from a panel of three in order of precedence for a period of 2 years, renewable up to a maximum of 4 consecutive years | Engineering Faculty Board |
1998-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Discontinuation, Committee on | 1 member from each Faculty (Engineering) from a panel of three in order of precedence for a period of 2 years, renewable up to a maximum of 4 consecutive years | Engineering Faculty Board |
2009-11-01 | 2013-06-30 | Joint Consultative Committee of HKU-SPACE and Faculties | The Faculty Associate Deans whose responsibilities include lifelong learning, nominated by Faculty Deans. | |
2014-07-01 | 2014-12-31 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other persons not being teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate on the recommendation of the Board, provided that the number of such persons shall not exceed one-fourth of the whole number of members of the Board | Senate |
1970-01-02 | 2009-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2009-07-17 | 2012-05-27 | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | |
2004-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | University Engineering Advisory Committee | Members of the Engineering Curriculum Review and Development Committee of the Board of the Fac of Engineering (ie the Chairman, being the Associate Dean of the Fac of Eng, the Heads of Dept and 1 member appointed by each Head of Dept of the Fac of Eng). | |
2001-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | University Engineering Advisory Committee | Members of the Engineering Curriculum Review and Development Committee of the Board of the Fac of Engineering (ie the Chairman, being the Associate Dean of the Fac of Eng, the Heads of Dept and 1 member appointed by each Head of Dept of the Fac of Eng). | |
2002-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | Enquiry into Possible Good Cause, Committee of | A panel of 12 members of the Senate who are teachers, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | University Engineering Advisory Committee | Members of the Engineering Curriculum Review and Development Committee of the Board of the Fac of Engineering (ie the Chairman, being the Associate Dean of the Fac of Eng, the Heads of Dept and 1 member appointed by each Head of Dept of the Fac of Eng). | |
2001-01-02 | 2001-06-30 | University Engineering Advisory Committee | Members of the Engineering Curriculum Review and Development Committee of the Board of the Fac of Engineering (ie the Chairman, being the Associate Dean of the Fac of Eng, the Heads of Dept and 1 member appointed by each Head of Dept of the Fac of Eng). |
Are You Missing Publications, Invited Lectures? Click Me.