Activity Title | Activity Type | Start Date | End Date | Member(s) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tsinghua University and The University of Hong Kong Talk for St. Joseph's College | Public Event (Delivering a Talk, Workshop, Exhibition, Performance, etc.) | 2023-07-14 | 2023-07-14 | ||
Interview by Master Insight on the topic "What is sustainable happiness?" (什麼是可持續的快樂?) | Books and Other Media (Newspaper, Radio/TV, etc.) for Non-academic Audiences | 2016-01-06 | 2016-01-06 |
Period | Position | Journal / Conference |
---|---|---|
2008 | Journal Editor Of 《華學》第九、十輯合刊 |
Start Date | End Date | Position | Type | Title |
---|---|---|---|---|
2004-04-01 | Member | O | Board of the Tung Lin Kok Yuen | |
2005-04-01 | 2007-04-01 | Member | O | Advisory Committee on Post-office Employment for Principal Officials under the Accountability System |
2003-09-01 | Member | O | Hong Kong Housing Authority Audit Committee | |
2006-03-01 | 2007-06-01 | Member | O | Commission on Strategic Development |
2004-09-01 | 2009-09-01 | Chairman | O | Veterinary Surgeons Board |
2003-06-01 | 2005-06-01 | Member | O | Board of Cyberport Corporation |
2003-01-01 | President | O | Fuhui Charitable Foundation | |
2006-08-01 | 2009-03-01 | Member | O | Sir Edward Youde Memorial Fund Council |
1997-09-01 | Chairman | O | Board, Hong Kong Institute for Promotion of Chinese Culture | |
2004-08-01 | 2007-06-01 | Chairman | O | Harbour Front Enhancement Committee |
2006-08-01 | Director | O | Wah Ching Chinese Medicine Foundation Ltd. | |
2001-07-01 | 2006-06-01 | Member | O | Research Grants Council |
2006-03-01 | Director | O | Law's Charitable Foundation | |
2004-11-01 | 2006-10-01 | Vice-chairman | O | Commmittee on Libraries |