Name Card
Emeritus Professor Cheung, Yau Kai 張佑啟
Title:
Honorary Professor
Honorary Professor
Department:
Faculty:
Supervision of Research Postgraduate Students
Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
Identification of dynamic load and vehicle parameters based on bridge dynamic responses | Building structure or bridge structure | 1999 Phd Jiang Ruijuan | |
Three-dimensional Vibration Analysis of Structural Elements Using Chebyshev-Ritz Method | Structural Dynamics | 2001 Phd Zhou Ding |
HKU Committee Appointments
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
1998-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Emeritus Professors Committee | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | Emeritus Professors Committee | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1988-03-04 | 1997-03-31 | Emeritus Professors Committee | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1998-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | Committees Review Committee | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | Committees Review Committee | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1988-03-04 | 1997-03-31 | Committees Review Committee | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1995-04-19 | 2004-01-28 | 9th Decade and Beyond, Committee on the | Members of the University staff | Council |
1998-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | Academic Board | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | Academic Board | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1988-07-01 | 1997-03-31 | Academic Board | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1996-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Academic Board | Provost and Deputy Vice-Chancellor (Vice-Chair) | |
1996-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | Court | Registrar | |
1996-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | General Purposes Committee | Deputy Vice-Chancellor | |
1996-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Vice-Chancellor's Resources Liaison Group | Deputy Vice-Chancellor | |
1998-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | General Purposes Committee | Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | General Purposes Committee | Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1988-07-01 | 1997-03-31 | General Purposes Committee | Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1977-08-08 | 2000-06-30 | Senate | Professors | |
1997-04-01 | 1997-04-15 | Centre of Urban Planning and Environmental Management Committee of Management | Chairman (a Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Senate for two years at a time) | Senate |
1996-04-01 | 1997-03-31 | Centre of Urban Planning and Environmental Management Committee of Management | Chairman (a Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Senate for two years at a time) | Senate |
1988-03-04 | 1996-03-31 | Centre of Urban Planning and Environmental Management Committee of Management | Chairman (a Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Senate for two years at a time) | Senate |
1987-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Appointment of Professors and Readers, Board for the | The Professors, provided that Emeritus Professors, Honorary Professors and part-time professors shall not be members under this category | |
1988-03-04 | 1994-03-31 | Leung Kau Kui Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | The Chairman of the Library Committee | |
1996-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | General Purposes Committee | Secretary | |
1998-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | Vice-Chancellor's Resources Liaison Group | Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | Vice-Chancellor's Resources Liaison Group | Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1998-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Estates Committee | One Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | Estates Committee | One Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1988-03-04 | 1997-03-31 | Estates Committee | One Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1996-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | 9th Decade and Beyond, Committee on the | Officers in Attendance | |
1996-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | Court | Secretary | |
1988-03-04 | 1994-03-31 | Robert Tam Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | The Chairman of the Library Committee | |
1996-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Court | Provost and Deputy Vice-Chancellor | |
1988-04-01 | 1994-03-31 | Court | Provost and Deputy Vice-Chancellor | |
1977-08-08 | 2000-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Professor in Faculty | |
1997-03-31 | Vice-Chancellor's Resources Liaison Group | Pro-Vice-Chancellors | President and Vice-Chancellor | |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | Leung Kau Kui Research and Teaching Endowment Fund Committee of Management | One Vice-President and Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the President and Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1988-03-04 | 1997-03-31 | Leung Kau Kui Research and Teaching Endowment Fund Committee of Management | One Vice-President and Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the President and Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1998-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Leung Kau Kui Research and Teaching Endowment Fund Committee of Management | One Vice-President and Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the President and Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | President and Vice-Chancellor |
2001-04-04 | 2003-05-31 | China Affairs, Advisory Committee on | Chairman | |
1995-11-08 | 1996-01-11 | Disability Action Committee | A Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | |
1996-03-21 | 1997-12-31 | Enquiry into Possible Good Cause, Committee of | The Deputy Vice-Chancellor or a Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1998-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Simon K.Y. Lee Research Fund in Linguistics Speech and Hearing Sciences Committee of Management | One Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
1996-07-01 | 1997-03-31 | Simon K.Y. Lee Research Fund in Linguistics Speech and Hearing Sciences Committee of Management | One Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | Simon K.Y. Lee Research Fund in Linguistics Speech and Hearing Sciences Committee of Management | One Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
1996-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | Disability Action Committee | The Registrar (ex-officio) | |
1996-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | Council | Secretary | |
1997-03-31 | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | A Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | President and Vice-Chancellor | |
1998-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | A Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | A Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1996-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Committees Review Committee | Provost and Deputy Vice-Chancellor | |
1996-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Council | Deputy Vice-Chancellor | |
1996-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Senate | Provost and Deputy Vice-Chancellor | |
2000-07-01 | 2003-12-31 | Estates Committee | The Chairman of each of its sub-committee(s) | |
1994-03-31 | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | The Chairman of the Library Committee | ||
1997-04-01 | 1997-04-30 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairman (President and Vice-Chancellor or his representative) | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1997-03-01 | 1997-03-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairman (President and Vice-Chancellor or his representative) | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1988-03-04 | 1996-06-30 | Simon K.Y. Lee Research Fund Committee of Management | One Pro-Vice-Chancellor | President and Vice-Chancellor |
2001-04-04 | 2003-05-31 | China Affairs, Advisory Committee on | Up to 12 members (including the Chairman) | |
1996-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | Environmental Health and Safety Committee | Officers in Attendance | |
1996-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | Court Life Membership Committee | Secretary | |
2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2002-07-01 | 2003-08-31 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2003-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2004-09-01 | 2006-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2006-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2009-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2012-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2015-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1988-03-04 | 1997-03-31 | Accommodation Committee | A Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Council on the recommendation of the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1998-01-01 | 2004-02-24 | Accommodation Committee | A Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Council on the recommendation of the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | Accommodation Committee | A Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Council on the recommendation of the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1996-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | Senate | Secretary | |
1998-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | Selection of Heads of Teaching Departments, Committee for the | One Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | Selection of Heads of Teaching Departments, Committee for the | One Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1996-06-28 | 1997-03-31 | Selection of Heads of Teaching Departments, Committee for the | One Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1998-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | Court | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | Court | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1994-04-01 | 1997-03-31 | Court | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1996-05-20 | 2000-06-30 | Finance Committee | The Deputy Vice-Chancellor | |
1998-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | Council | Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | Council | Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1988-04-01 | 1997-03-31 | Council | Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
1994-10-26 | 1996-06-30 | Simon K.Y. Lee Research Fund in Linguistics Speech and Hearing Sciences Committee of Management | One Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Senate | Senate |
Are You Missing Publications, Invited Lectures? Click Me.