1993-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | Careers Advisory Board | Seven teachers of the University appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Senate |
1993-01-01 | 2005-06-21 | Appointment of Professors and Readers, Board for the | The Professors, provided that Emeritus Professors, Honorary Professors and part-time professors shall not be members under this category | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
1996-07-01 | 1999-08-31 | Discontinuation, Committee on | Chairman (Member of the Senate appointed by the Senate for 2 years) | Senate |
1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | Discontinuation, Committee on | Chairman (Member of the Senate appointed by the Senate for 2 years) | Senate |
1993-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | Discontinuation, Committee on | Vice-Chairman (Member of the Senate appointed by the Senate for 2 years) | Senate |
1993-01-01 | 2003-10-31 | Senate | Professors | |
2003-11-28 | 2006-11-27 | Senate | 12 elected Professors (Group A) | |
2004-01-01 | 2004-12-31 | Selection of Senior Teachers, Committee for the | One teacher of the relevant Faculty Board, elected by the Board, for a period of twelve months | |
2001-01-01 | 2001-12-31 | Selection of Senior Teachers, Committee for the | One teacher of the relevant Faculty Board, elected by the Board, for a period of twelve months | |
2002-01-01 | 2002-12-31 | Selection of Senior Teachers, Committee for the | One teacher of the relevant Faculty Board, elected by the Board, for a period of twelve months | Law Faculty Board |
2000-01-01 | 2000-12-31 | Selection of Senior Teachers, Committee for the | One teacher of the relevant Faculty Board, elected by the Board, for a period of twelve months | Law Faculty Board |
2002-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | Selection of Heads of Teaching Departments, Committee for the | A professor, holding an established chair or a personal professorship, elected from among members of the relevant faculty board for a period of two years | Law Faculty Board |
2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | Selection of Heads of Teaching Departments, Committee for the | A professor, holding an established chair or a personal professorship, elected from among members of the relevant faculty board for a period of two years | Law Faculty Board |
1998-11-02 | 2000-06-30 | Selection of Heads of Teaching Departments, Committee for the | A professor, holding an established chair or a personal professorship, elected from among members of the relevant faculty board for a period of two years | Law Faculty Board |
2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | |
1993-01-01 | 2006-06-30 | Faculty of Law, Board of the | Professor in Faculty | |
2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | Faculty of Law, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |