Supervision of Research Postgraduate Students
HKU Committee Appointments
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
2010-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | Faculty of Business and Economics, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2007-08-03 | 2010-06-30 | Faculty of Business and Economics, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1991-09-04 | 2020-06-30 | Faculty of Science, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2004-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | Faculty of Social Sciences, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2004-01-02 | 2004-06-30 | Faculty of Social Sciences, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2001-04-04 | 2003-08-31 | Faculty of Social Sciences, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1994-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | Faculty of Social Sciences, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |