Term | Code | Class | Title |
---|---|---|---|
2024 S2 | CCST9012 | 2AX | Our Place in the Universe |
Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
MORPHO-KINEMATIC MODELING OF PLANETARY NEBULAE | Interstellar Medium | 2006 MPhil Chan Tsz Pan Henry | |
MILLIMETER-WAVELENGTH SPECTRAL LINE SURVEYS OF EVOLVED CIRCUMSTELLAR ENVELOPES | Astrophysics | 2011 MPhil Chau Wayne C | |
VLBA OBSERVATIONS AND KINEMATIC MODELLING OF THE HIGH VELOCITY MOLECULAR JETS FROM THE WATER FOUNTAIN IRAS 18286-0959 | Astrophysics | 2008 MPhil Yung Hong Kiu Bosco | |
MASER AND INFRARED PROPERTIES OF RED SUPERGIANTS EMBEDDED IN THE SUPER STAR CLUSTER WESTERLUND 1 | Radio Interterometric Observations of Evolved Stars | 2009 MPhil Fok Kai Tung | |
THREE DIMENSIONAL MORPHOLOGY OF THE DUMBBELL NEBULA AND THE RING NEBULA | Astrophysics | 2007 MPhil Chong Sze Ning | |
IDENTIFICATION OF OXYGEN-RICH EVOLVED STARS BY MASER SURVEYS AND STATISTICAL STUDIES ON INFRARED DATA | Observation Astronomy | 2010 Phd Yung Hong Kiu Bosco |
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2006-02-01 | 2006-11-09 | University Admissions Committee | The Chairman of each Faculty Admissions Committee or his representative | |
2006-02-01 | 2009-04-05 | Cognitive Science, Board of Studies in | The Deans of the Faculties or their nominees, contributing to the teaching of the degree programme | |
2011-02-01 | 2016-01-31 | Committees Review Committee | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2006-02-01 | 2011-01-31 | Committees Review Committee | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2011-02-01 | 2016-01-31 | Court Life Membership Committee | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2006-02-01 | 2011-01-31 | Court Life Membership Committee | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2012-12-09 | 2015-12-08 | Council | 4 full-time teachers elected in accordance with regulations | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2010-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2011-02-01 | 2016-01-31 | Senate | Dean of each Faculty | |
2006-02-01 | 2011-01-31 | Senate | Dean of each Faculty | |
2007-05-21 | 2010-05-20 | Honorary Degrees Committee | 3 Deans of Faculties, elected by the Senate | Senate |
2012-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | Enquiry into Possible Good Cause, Committee of | A panel of 12 members of the Senate who are teachers, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | Enquiry into Possible Good Cause, Committee of | A panel of 12 members of the Senate who are teachers, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2011-02-01 | 2016-01-31 | Faculty of Science, Board of the | Dean | |
2006-02-01 | 2011-01-31 | Faculty of Science, Board of the | Dean | |
2016-02-01 | 2018-01-31 | Faculty of Science, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2006-02-01 | 2010-06-30 | Faculty of Science, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2015-01-30 | 2015-12-08 | Human Resource Policy Committee | 1 academic member of the Council, appointed by the Council | Council |
2013-01-30 | 2015-01-29 | Human Resource Policy Committee | 1 academic member of the Council, appointed by the Council | Council |
2011-02-01 | 2016-01-31 | Senior Management Team and the Deans, Committee of the | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2006-02-01 | 2011-01-31 | Senior Management Team and the Deans, Committee of the | The Dean of each Faculty |