Term | Code | Class | Title |
---|---|---|---|
2019 S2 | CHEM3141 | 2A | Environmental chemistry |
2018 S2 | CHEM1044 | 2A | Mathematics in chemistry |
2018 S2 | CHEM3141 | 2A | Environmental chemistry |
2018 S2 | SCNC1112 | 2B | Fundamentals of modern science |
2018 S1 | SCNC1112 | 1A | Fundamentals of modern science |
Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
CAVITY RINGDOWN SPECTROSCOPY OF DIATOMIC MOLECULES | Analytical Chemistry | 2004 MPhil Wong Mo Yee | |
CATALYTIC FORMATION OF POLYCYCLIC AROMATIC HYDROCARBONS FROM ACETYLENE OVER SILICON CARBIDE | Physical Chemistry | 2012 MPhil Zhao Tianqi | |
ELECTRONIC SPECTROSCOPY OF TRANSITION METAL MONOFLUORIDES | Physical Chemistry - Molecular Spectroscopy | 2014 MPhil Ng Kiu Fung | |
ELECTRONIC SPECTROSCOPY OF IRIDIUM CONTAINING DIATOMIC MOLECULES | Physical Chemistry-Molecular Spectroscopy | 2008 Phd Pang Hon Fung | |
CATALYTIC METHANE DEHYDROAROMATIZATION AND POLYCYCLIC AROMATIC HYDROCARBONS FORMATION ON GRAIN SURFACE REACTION STUDIES USING TIME OF FLIGHT MASS SPECTROMETRY | Physical Chemistry | 2009 Phd Tian Ming | |
THEORETICAL STUDIES OF TRANSITION METAL CONTAINING DIATOMICS AND DNA ELECTRON TRANSFER | Physical Chemistry | 1999 Phd Tong So Ming | |
LASER SPECTROSCOPY OF IRIDIUM COMPOUNDS | Physical Chemistry - Molecular Spectroscopy | 2006 MPhil Pang Hon Fung | |
ELECTRONIC SPECTROSCOPY OF TRANSITION METAL DIMER | Physical Chemistry | 2012 MPhil Qian Yue | |
ELECTRONIC SPECTROSCOPY OF TRANSITION METAL MONOHALIDES | Physical Chemistry | 2002 Phd Ye Jianjun | |
ELECTRONIC TRANSITIONS OF TRANSITION METAL MONOBORIDE AND MONOXIDES | Physical Chemistry - Molecular Spectroscopy | 2010 Phd Wang Na | |
ELECTRONIC SPECTROSCOPY OF COBALT MONOHALIDES AND NITRIC OXIDE | Physical Chemistry | 2002 MPhil Wong Lai | |
ELECTRONIC TRANSITIONS OF TRANSITION METAL MONOBORIDES | Physical Chemistry | 2010 Phd Ng Yuk Wai | |
HIGH RESOLUTION SPECTROSCOPY OF SCANDIUM MONOHALIDES | Physical Chemistry | 2008 Phd Xia Ye | |
CATALYTIC METHANE REFORMATION AND AROMATIZATION REACTION STUDIES VIA CAVITY RINGDOWN SPECTROSCOPY AND TIME OF FLIGHT MASS SPECTROMETRY | Physical Chemistry - Molecular Spectroscopy | 2003 Phd Li Ling | |
LASER SPECTROSCOPY OF TRANSITION METAL NITRIDES | Molecular Spectroscopy | 1995 Phd Jiang He | |
LABORATORY ASTROCHEMISTRY: CATALYTIC REACTIONS OF ORGANIC MOLECULES ON OLIVINE-TYPE SILICATES AND SILICON CARBIDE | Physical Chemistry | 2014 Phd Li Qian |
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2000-01-01 | 2002-12-31 | Library Committee | The Dean or Associate Dean of each Faculty, or his/her nominee | |
2003-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | Library Committee | The Dean or Associate Dean of each Faculty, or his/her nominee | |
2006-01-01 | 2006-12-31 | Library Committee | The Dean or Associate Dean of each Faculty, or his/her nominee | |
2007-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | Library Committee | The Dean or Associate Dean of each Faculty, or his/her nominee | |
2009-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | Library Committee | The Dean or Associate Dean of each Faculty, or his/her nominee | |
1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | Senate | Other Heads of Teaching Department | |
2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | Student Finance, Committee on | Two members, from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff of the University appointed by the Senate. | Senate |
2006-09-01 | 2008-08-31 | Student Finance, Committee on | Two members, from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff of the University appointed by the Senate. | Senate |
2008-09-01 | 2009-08-24 | Student Finance, Committee on | Two members, from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff of the University appointed by the Senate. | Senate |
2004-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | Student Finance, Committee on | Two members, from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff of the University appointed by the Senate. | Senate |
1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | Student Finance, Committee on | Two members, from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff of the University appointed by the Senate. | Senate |
1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | Student Finance, Committee on | Two members, from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff of the University appointed by the Senate. | Senate |
2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | Student Finance, Committee on | Two members, from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff of the University appointed by the Senate. | Senate |
2006-02-01 | 2007-06-30 | Curriculum Development Committee | A representative from each Faculty | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | Curriculum Development Committee | A representative from each Faculty | |
2005-01-10 | 2011-01-31 | Joint Consultative Committee of HKU-SPACE and Faculties | The Faculty Associate Deans whose responsibilities include lifelong learning, nominated by Faculty Deans. | |
1985-09-04 | 2004-12-31 | Faculty of Science, Board of the | Senior Lecturers in Faculty | |
2006-11-10 | 2011-01-31 | University Admissions Committee | The Chairman of each Faculty Admissions Committee or his representative | |
2005-01-01 | 2014-06-30 | Faculty of Science, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2014-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | Faculty of Science, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | Rayson Huang Endowment Fund Committee of Management | Head, Department of Chemistry | |
1995-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Science Faculty Board |
1995-06-29 | 1995-06-30 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Science Faculty Board |
2004-09-30 | 2008-06-30 | Student Affairs, Committee on | The Chairperson of each of its sub-committees (Careers and Placement Committee) | |
2003-01-01 | 2004-12-31 | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | |
2007-01-01 | 2008-05-05 | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | |
2009-08-25 | 2011-08-24 | Student Finance, Committee on | Vice-Chairman, appointed by the Senate from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff for two years at a time | Senate |
2011-08-25 | 2013-08-24 | Student Finance, Committee on | Vice-Chairman, appointed by the Senate from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff for two years at a time | Senate |
2013-08-25 | 2015-08-24 | Student Finance, Committee on | Vice-Chairman, appointed by the Senate from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff for two years at a time | Senate |
2003-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | Cognitive Science, Board of Studies in | The Deans of the Faculties or their nominees, contributing to the teaching of the degree programme | |
2000-01-01 | 2002-12-31 | Senate | Associate Dean of each Faculty | |
2003-01-01 | 2003-10-31 | Senate | Associate Dean of each Faculty | |
2004-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | Careers Advisory Board | Seven teachers of the University appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Senate |
2003-03-01 | 2004-06-30 | Careers Advisory Board | Seven teachers of the University appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Senate |
2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | Careers Advisory Board | Seven teachers of the University appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Senate |
2015-09-07 | 2017-08-24 | Student Finance, Committee on | Vice-Chairman, appointed by the Senate from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff for two years at a time | |
1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | Student Finance, Committee on | Two members, from amongst professoriate and non-professoriate teaching staff of the University appointed by the Senate. | Senate |
2006-02-01 | 2006-12-31 | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee |