Term | Code | Class | Title |
---|---|---|---|
2018 S1 | PSYC2072 | 1A | Research internship in psychology I |
2018 S1 | PSYC6101 | FA | Thesis |
2018 S2 | PSYC6101 | FA | Thesis |
Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
The Conversion of Sedentary Time to Active Time in Children: The Role of Activity Enhanced Video Game Play | Children and Physical Activity | 2006 Phd Mellecker Robin Rochelle | |
An Investigation into Two-digit Number Processing among Chinese Children and Adults | Cognitive Psychology | 2007 MPhil Chan Wai Lan | |
Time Perception Deficit in ADHD and Its Correlations with Early ADHD Symptoms and Early Academic Abilities | Psychology | 2018 Phd Zheng Que | |
Acquiring A Better English Accent by Second Language Adolescent Learners - What can Passive Exposure Do? | Health Education in Developmental Psychology | 2003 MPhil Ho Yiu Shun Johnson | |
Strategic Counting: A Novel Assessment of Place-Value Understanding | Educational Psychology | 2009 Phd Chan Wai Lan | |
Learning to Read in Two Languages: Chinese and English | Educational Psychology | 2011 Phd Shum Kar Man Kathy | |
When Free-play Time Is Scarce in Preschool: What Predicts Peer Acceptance and Friendship? | Social Emotional Development, Parent-child Relation | 2012 Phd Tse Man Yan | |
Psoriasis, its two labels in Chinese and its psychological impacts | Health Psychology | 2006 Phd Cheung Tat Boris | |
Compensatory behavioral intentions: The unintended effect of intervention cost | Counterfactual Thinking and Theory | 2005 MPhil Pang Lai Ming | |
Effectiveness of Attention Bias Modification Treatment for Children with Social Anxiety Problem | Psychology | 2011 Phd Cheung Man Ching | |
Motor Experience Modulates Perceptual Representation of Objects: The Case of Chinese Character Recognition | Language Development and Psycholinguistics | 2010 MPhil Tso Ricky Van Yip | |
The Neural Correlates and Behavioural Expertise Markers of Word Recognition Is Modulated by the Type of Learning Experiences | Educational Psychology | 2013 Phd Tso Ricky Van Yip | |
When the Cantonese 'b' is the English /p/: Stop-consonant Voicing Strategies across Languages | Language and Bilingualism | 2007 MPhil Chan Siu Wing | |
Self-regulation in Children with Autism Spectrum Disorder: Its Significance in Assessment, School Adjustment, and Intervention | PhD with a Specialization in Educational Psychology | 2014 Phd Ma Tin Shu Terence | |
Examining the Theoretical Determinates of Operational Momentum | Developmental Psychology | 2015 MPhil Lau Tsz Tan | |
Social Defeat and Psychosis Proneness: An Exploration of Underlying Mechanisms | Psychology | 2011 Phd Cotier Francesca Alice | |
Psychosis Proneness in the Chinese Population: Psychometric Measurement and Psychological Risk Mechanism | Clinical Psychology | 2012 Phd Mark Winifred | |
Psychosis Proneness, Working Memory, and the Developing Brain: A Multi-analytic Approach | Psychosis Proneness in Adolescents | 2013 Phd Andre Julia Alisha | |
On Raising Emotionally Competent Preschoolers in China: Contribution of Parenting Styles and Parental Emotion Regulation Strategies, and Preliminary Evaluation of an Emotion Coaching Parenting Intervention | Educational and Developmental Psychology | 2016 Phd Qiu Chen | |
Psychology | 2017 Others Chan Wing Ying |
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | 2020-12-31 | Emeritus Professors Committee | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2016-01-26 | 2019-06-30 | Emeritus Professors Committee | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2016-01-26 | 2019-06-30 | Budget and Resources Committee | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-12-31 | Budget and Resources Committee | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-12-31 | Committees Review Committee | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2016-01-26 | 2019-06-30 | Committees Review Committee | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2007-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | University Selection and Promotion Committee | 3 Chair Prof (excluding any who is a Dean) appointed by VC, in consultation with HRPC, for a period of 24 months, with 1 Chair Prof from among members of each of the following groups of Bds of Fac:(a) Dent/Med(b) Arch/Eng/Sci(c) Arts/B&E/Edu/Law/SocSci | Council |
2016-01-26 | 2019-06-30 | Academic Board | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-12-31 | Academic Board | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2012-02-13 | 2014-02-12 | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | 6 members from the University, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2007-01-18 | 2010-01-17 | Senate | 12 elected Professors (Group A) | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-12-31 | Faculty of Social Sciences, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2002-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | Faculty of Social Sciences, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2002-07-01 | 2005-06-21 | Appointment of Professors and Readers, Board for the | The Professors, provided that Emeritus Professors, Honorary Professors and part-time professors shall not be members under this category | |
2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | Human Research Ethics Committee | Chairman [appointed by Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Research)] | Sub-committee |
2006-06-01 | 2007-01-31 | Human Research Ethics Committee | Chairman [appointed by Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Research)] | Sub-committee |
2019-07-01 | 2020-12-31 | Senior Management Team and the Deans, Committee of the | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2016-01-26 | 2019-06-30 | Senior Management Team and the Deans, Committee of the | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2007-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2009-07-01 | 2010-01-17 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2013-01-01 | 2014-12-31 | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | Three members of the University Research Committee, nominated by the Chairman of the University Research Committee for two years at a time | |
2015-01-01 | 2016-03-31 | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | Three members of the University Research Committee, nominated by the Chairman of the University Research Committee for two years at a time | |
2008-07-01 | 2010-01-17 | Enquiry into Possible Good Cause, Committee of | A panel of 12 members of the Senate who are teachers, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2005-07-26 | 2007-04-30 | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | Two University representatives external to the Institute, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Senate |
2013-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | University Research Committee | Up to four teachers co-opted by the Committee for one year at a time | |
2014-01-01 | 2014-12-31 | University Research Committee | Up to four teachers co-opted by the Committee for one year at a time | |
2015-01-01 | 2015-12-31 | University Research Committee | Up to four teachers co-opted by the Committee for one year at a time | |
2016-01-01 | 2016-12-31 | University Research Committee | Up to four teachers co-opted by the Committee for one year at a time | |
2017-02-10 | 2018-08-31 | Equal Opportunity Committee | Additional members co-opted by the Committee from time to time | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-12-31 | Senate | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2016-01-26 | 2019-06-30 | Senate | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2009-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | University Selection and Promotion Committee | 3 Chair Prof (excluding any who is a Dean) appointed by VC, in consultation with HRPC, for a period of 24 months, with 1 Chair Prof from among members of each of the following groups of Bds of Fac:(a) Dent/Med(b) Arch/Eng/Sci(c) Arts/B&E/Edu/Law/SocSci | |
2011-01-01 | 2011-12-31 | University Selection and Promotion Committee | 3 Chair Prof (excluding any who is a Dean) appointed by VC, in consultation with HRPC, for a period of 24 months, with 1 Chair Prof from among members of each of the following groups of Bds of Fac:(a) Dent/Med(b) Arch/Eng/Sci(c) Arts/B&E/Edu/Law/SocSci | |
2012-01-01 | 2012-06-30 | University Selection and Promotion Committee | 3 Chair Prof (excluding any who is a Dean) appointed by VC, in consultation with HRPC, for a period of 24 months, with 1 Chair Prof from among members of each of the following groups of Bds of Fac:(a) Dent/Med(b) Arch/Eng/Sci(c) Arts/B&E/Edu/Law/SocSci | |
2019-07-01 | 2020-12-31 | Court | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2016-01-26 | 2019-06-30 | Court | Vice-Presidents and Pro-Vice-Chancellors | |
2018-09-01 | 2020-12-31 | Equal Opportunity Committee | A member of the Senior Management Team, appointed by the President and Vice-Chancellor (Chairperson) | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | Senate | Professors |