Supervision of Research Postgraduate Students
HKU Committee Appointments
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
2008-10-02 | 2010-10-04 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2017-10-02 | 2020-10-01 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2011-10-02 | 2014-10-01 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2014-10-02 | 2017-10-01 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2010-10-05 | 2011-10-01 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2020-10-02 | 2023-10-01 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | Such other persons not being teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate on the recommendation of the Board, provided that the number of such persons shall not exceed one-fourth of the whole number of members of the Board | |
2023-10-02 | | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | Such other persons not being teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate on the recommendation of the Board, provided that the number of such persons shall not exceed one-fourth of the whole number of members of the Board | Medicine Faculty Board |