Supervision of Research Postgraduate Students
HKU Committee Appointments
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
1998-11-01 | 2000-06-30 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1995-12-13 | 1998-10-31 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1994-08-22 | 1997-08-21 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | Lecturers in Faculty | |
1997-08-22 | 2023-06-30 | Faculty of Medicine, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |