Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
Status as mechanism to Co-opt the board: Evidence from Hong Kong natural experiments | Accountancy | 2013 Phd Lowry Michelle Rene | |
Too Big to Fail, Too Big to Succeed or Too Complex to Succeed? Evidence for U.S. Bank Holding Companies | Accounting | 2011 Phd Wang Shixuan | |
Economic Consequences of Accounting Conservatism | Accounting | 2008 Phd Ma Lizhi |
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2007-09-01 | 2009-10-18 | Senate | Dean of each Faculty | |
2007-09-01 | 2009-10-18 | BoS in Business Administration and Law | Three members from the Faculty of Business and Economics, including the Dean or his/her delegate, Programme Director and Deputy Programme Director of BBA(Law) | Dean of Business and Economics |
2007-09-01 | 2009-10-18 | Court Life Membership Committee | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2009-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2007-09-01 | 2008-09-08 | Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | The Chair of each Faculty Teaching and Learning Quality Committee | |
2007-09-01 | 2009-10-18 | Faculty of Business and Economics, Board of the | Dean | |
2007-09-01 | 2009-04-05 | Cognitive Science, Board of Studies in | The Deans of the Faculties or their nominees, contributing to the teaching of the degree programme | |
2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | Enquiry into Possible Good Cause, Committee of | A panel of 12 members of the Senate who are teachers, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2007-09-01 | 2009-10-18 | BoS in Business Administration (Information Systems) and Engineering (Computer Science) | Three members from the Faculty of Business and Economics, including the Dean or his/her delegate, Programme Director and Deputy Programme Director of BBA(IS) | Dean of Business and Economics |
2007-09-01 | 2009-10-18 | Senior Management Team and the Deans, Committee of the | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2007-09-01 | 2009-10-18 | Committees Review Committee | The Dean of each Faculty | |
2007-09-01 | 2017-06-30 | Faculty of Business and Economics, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University |