Term | Code | Class | Title |
---|---|---|---|
2024 S1 | DASC7606 | 1A | Deep learning |
2024 S1 | DASC7606 | 1B | Deep learning |
2023 S2 | DASC7606 | 2A | Deep learning |
2023 S2 | DASC7606 | 2B | Deep learning |
2023 S2 | DASC7606 | 2C | Deep learning |
2020 S1 | DASC7600 | 1A | Data science project |
2020 S2 | DASC7606 | 2A | Deep learning |
2020 S2 | DASC7606 | 2B | Deep learning |
2020 S2 | COMP7606 | 2A | Deep learning |
2020 S2 | COMP7606 | 2B | Deep learning |
2021 S2 | DASC7606 | 2A | Deep learning |
2021 S2 | DASC7606 | 2B | Deep learning |
2019 S2 | COMP7606 | 2A | Deep learning |
2019 S2 | COMP7606 | 2B | Deep learning |
2019 S2 | COMP7606 | 2C | Deep learning |
2019 S2 | DASC7606 | 2A | Deep learning |
2019 S2 | DASC7606 | 2B | Deep learning |
2019 S2 | DASC7606 | 2C | Deep learning |
2022 S2 | DASC7606 | 2A | Deep learning |
2022 S2 | DASC7606 | 2B | Deep learning |
2022 S2 | DASC7606 | 2C | Deep learning |
2024 S2 | DASC7606 | 2A | Deep learning |
2024 S2 | DASC7606 | 2B | Deep learning |
2024 S2 | DASC7606 | 2C | Deep learning |
2024 S1 | DASC7606 | 1D | Deep learning |
Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
Online Algorithms for the Provision of Quality of Service in Networks | Algorithms | 2001 Phd Fung Ping Yuen | |
Predicting Metabolic Pathways from Metabolic Networks | Bioinformatics | 2007 MPhil Leung Shuen Yi | |
A Fast Probabilistic Method for Vehicle Detection and Tracking with an Explicit Contour Model | Computer Graphics & Computer Vision | 2003 MPhil Yiu Wai Sing | |
Shadow Identification in Traffic Video Sequences | Computer Vision | 2003 MPhil So Wai Ki | |
A Split-and-Merge Approach for Quadrilateral-Based Image Segmentation | Vision and Algorithms | 2004 MPhil Chen Zhuo | |
Learning Sparse Structural Associations from Data | Algorithm, Bioinformatics | 2014 Phd Yang Jie | |
A Novel Framework for Binning Environmental Genomic Fragments | Whole Genome Alignment; Short Reads Assembly | 2009 MPhil Yang Bin | |
Iterative de Bruijn Graph Assemblers for Second-generation Sequencing Reads | Bioinformatics | 2009 Phd Peng Yu | |
Phylogenetic Tree Reconstruction with Protein Linkage | Bioinformatics, Design and Analysis of Algorithms | 2010 MPhil Yu Junjie | |
Binning and Annotation for Metagenomic Next-Generation Sequencing Reads | Bio-informatics | 2012 Phd Wang Yi | |
Finding Motif Pairs from Protein Interaction Networks | Bioinformatics | 2006 MPhil Siu Man Hung | |
Computational Approaches for Protein Functions and Gene Association Networks | Bioinformatics & Computational Genomics | 2009 Phd Yalamanchili Hari Krishna | |
Approximation for Minimum Triangulations of Convex Polyhedra | Computational geometry, databases, cryptography | 1999 MPhil Fung Ping Yuen | |
Motif Discovery for DNA Sequences | Algorithms | 2003 Phd Leung Chi Ming | |
Algorithms on Constrained Sequence Alignment | Algorithm and Data Structure (Computer Science) | 2002 MPhil Ho Ngai Lam | |
On The Traffic Flow Control System | Algorithm Design and Analysis | 2004 MPhil Yan Li |
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2000-10-01 | 2002-09-30 | Selection of Heads of Teaching Departments, Committee for the | A professor, holding an established chair or a personal professorship, elected from among members of the relevant faculty board for a period of two years | Engineering Faculty Board |
1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | Electronic Services Unit Committee of Management | The Chairman appointed by the Senate from among members for two years at a time | Senate |
1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | School of Professional and Continuing Education, Board of Studies of the | Such other teachers as the Senate may appoint to the Board | Senate |
1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | School of Professional and Continuing Education, Board of Studies of the | Such other teachers as the Senate may appoint to the Board | Senate |
1994-06-30 | School of Professional and Continuing Education, Board of Studies of the | Such other teachers as the Senate may appoint to the Board | Senate | |
2003-11-28 | 2006-11-27 | Senate | 12 elected Professors (Group A) | |
2007-01-12 | 2010-01-11 | Senate | 12 elected Professors (Group A) | |
1998-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Senate member appointed by the Council to the JUCC | Council |
1995-07-01 | 1998-08-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Senate member appointed by the Council to the JUCC | Council |
1991-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Senate member appointed by the Council to the JUCC | Council |
2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Senate member appointed by the Council to the JUCC | Council |
2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Senate member appointed by the Council to the JUCC | Council |
2004-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Senate member appointed by the Council to the JUCC | Council |
2006-09-01 | 2009-08-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Senate member appointed by the Council to the JUCC | Council |
2009-09-01 | 2010-01-11 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Senate member appointed by the Council to the JUCC | Council |
1989-08-01 | 2003-10-31 | Senate | Professors | |
1989-08-01 | 2005-06-21 | Appointment of Professors and Readers, Board for the | The Professors, provided that Emeritus Professors, Honorary Professors and part-time professors shall not be members under this category | |
2002-07-01 | 2002-07-31 | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Dean and Associate Deans of the Graduate School | |
2002-08-01 | 2004-07-31 | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Dean and Associate Deans of the Graduate School | |
2004-08-01 | 2006-07-31 | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Dean and Associate Deans of the Graduate School | |
1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | Hong Kong and China Gas Company Ltd. Postgraduate Scholarships Fund Selection Committee | Head, Department of Computer Science | |
1988-07-01 | 1996-12-31 | Hong Kong and China Gas Company Ltd. Postgraduate Scholarships Fund Selection Committee | Head, Department of Computer Science | |
2006-08-26 | 2008-06-30 | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Two teachers appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Senate |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | Board of Examination for Graduate Studies | Two teachers appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Senate |
1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | Faculty of Science, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1993-07-01 | 1996-12-31 | Faculty of Science, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1990-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | Faculty of Science, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1998-09-01 | 2000-01-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Vice-Chairman (a teacher appointed by the Senate) | Senate |
1995-07-01 | 1998-08-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Vice-Chairman (a teacher appointed by the Senate) | Senate |
1991-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Vice-Chairman (a teacher appointed by the Senate) | Senate |
2008-07-01 | 2010-01-11 | Budget and Resources Committee | Two teachers from the Senate, not being Deans of Faculties, elected by the Senate | |
1991-02-08 | 1996-06-30 | Catering, Committee on | Chairman, appointed by the Senate from among teachers for two years at a time | Senate |
2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2014-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
1988-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2010-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | Faculty of Engineering, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2002-07-01 | 2002-07-31 | Postgraduate Education, Policy Board of | Dean and Associate Deans of Graduate School | |
2002-08-01 | 2004-07-31 | Postgraduate Education, Policy Board of | Dean and Associate Deans of Graduate School | |
2004-08-01 | 2006-07-31 | Postgraduate Education, Policy Board of | Dean and Associate Deans of Graduate School | |
2002-07-01 | 2002-07-31 | Board of Graduate Studies | Dean and Associate Deans of the Graduate School | |
2002-08-01 | 2004-07-31 | Board of Graduate Studies | Dean and Associate Deans of the Graduate School | |
2004-08-01 | 2006-07-31 | Board of Graduate Studies | Dean and Associate Deans of the Graduate School | |
1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | Student Affairs, Committee on | The Chairperson of each of its sub-committee (Committee on Catering) | |
1997-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | School of Business, Board of Studies of the | Such other teachers, including part-time teachers of the School, as the Senate may appoint to the Board. | Senate |
1999-07-01 | 2000-12-31 | School of Business, Board of Studies of the | Such other teachers, including part-time teachers of the School, as the Senate may appoint to the Board. | Senate |
2009-01-19 | 2011-01-18 | Research and Conference Grants, Committee on | The Vice-Chairman, appointed by the Senate from among teachers for two years at a time | Senate |
2011-01-19 | 2012-01-18 | Research and Conference Grants, Committee on | The Vice-Chairman, appointed by the Senate from among teachers for two years at a time | Senate |
1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2004-07-27 | 2005-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2009-07-01 | 2010-01-11 | Disciplinary Committee | Teacher Panel | Senate |
2007-02-27 | 2009-02-28 | Discontinuation, Committee on | Chairman (Member of the Senate appointed by the Senate for 2 years) | Senate |
2009-03-01 | 2010-01-11 | Discontinuation, Committee on | Chairman (Member of the Senate appointed by the Senate for 2 years) | Senate |
1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | University Engineering Advisory Committee | Members of the Engineering Curriculum Review and Development Committee of the Board of the Fac of Engineering (ie the Chairman, being the Associate Dean of the Fac of Eng, the Heads of Dept and 1 member appointed by each Head of Dept of the Fac of Eng). | |
1986-02-01 | 1996-12-31 | University Engineering Advisory Committee | Members of the Engineering Curriculum Review and Development Committee of the Board of the Fac of Engineering (ie the Chairman, being the Associate Dean of the Fac of Eng, the Heads of Dept and 1 member appointed by each Head of Dept of the Fac of Eng). | |
2000-02-18 | 2004-01-27 | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | Two additional Senate members, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | President and Vice-Chancellor |
1996-05-01 | 1998-06-30 | Enquiry into Possible Good Cause, Committee of | A panel of 12 members of the Senate who are teachers, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
2004-08-03 | 2006-06-30 | Enquiry into Possible Good Cause, Committee of | A panel of 12 members of the Senate who are teachers, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Senate |
1996-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | Faculty of Social Sciences, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1990-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | Faculty of Social Sciences, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1999-07-01 | 1999-12-31 | Faculty of Social Sciences, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1996-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | Faculty of Arts, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1990-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | Faculty of Arts, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
1999-07-01 | 1999-12-31 | Faculty of Arts, Board of the | Such other teachers as may be appointed to the Board by the Senate | Senate |
2012-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | Board of Graduate Studies | Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee | |
2000-04-12 | 2002-04-11 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairman (President and Vice-Chancellor or his representative) | |
2002-06-03 | 2004-04-11 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairman (President and Vice-Chancellor or his representative) | |
2004-12-13 | 2006-04-11 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairman (President and Vice-Chancellor or his representative) | |
2006-04-12 | 2008-04-11 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairman (President and Vice-Chancellor or his representative) | |
2008-04-12 | 2010-01-11 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairman (President and Vice-Chancellor or his representative) |