Status | Thesis Title | Field of Study | Student |
---|---|---|---|
Regulation of cell proliferation in dental pulp stem cells through over-expression of Bc1-2 | Endodontics | 2012 MPhil Liu Yuan | |
Antimicrobial Effects of Biological and Synthetic Micro-/nano-patterned Arrays | Endodontology | 2013 Phd Li Xin | |
Endodontic treatment outcomes: patient based assessments | Patient-based Endodontic Treatment Outcomes | 2006 Phd Liu Pei | |
Possibility for keyhole surgery to enhance periapical healing using laser photodynamic therapy: physical and biological considerations | Lasers in Dentistry | 2014 Phd Govindool Sharaschandra Reddy | |
Effects of enterococcus faecalis and its lipoteichoic acid on osteoclasts and osteoblasts | Endodontics | 2012 Phd Wang Shuai |
Start Date | End Date | Committee | Category | Body |
---|---|---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2009-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | Academic Awards, Board of | An Associate Dean (Undergraduate Education/Teaching and Learning), appointed on rotational basis for two years at a time, from Faculty Cluster B (Arts, Business & Economics, Education and Social Sciences) | |
2007-10-21 | 2009-10-20 | Discontinuation, Committee on | 1 member from each Faculty (Dentistry) from a panel of three in order of precedence for a period of 2 years, renewable up to a maximum of 4 consecutive years | Dentistry Faculty Board |
2013-02-01 | 2014-05-02 | Discontinuation, Committee on | 1 member from each Faculty (Dentistry) from a panel of three in order of precedence for a period of 2 years, renewable up to a maximum of 4 consecutive years | Dentistry Faculty Board |
2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | Student Grievances, Committee of Enquiry into | Two other members of the Grievances Panel, appointed by the Chairman: members of the Panel | Council |
2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | Student Grievances, Committee of Enquiry into | Two other members of the Grievances Panel, appointed by the Chairman: members of the Panel | Council |
2011-04-28 | 2011-12-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | |
2012-01-01 | 2012-12-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | |
2011-04-28 | 2011-12-31 | Library Committee | The Chairman of each Faculty Library Committee and the Chairman of the Committee on Information Technology and Educational Resources (CITER) of the Faculty of Dentistry | |
2012-01-01 | 2012-12-31 | Library Committee | The Chairman of each Faculty Library Committee and the Chairman of the Committee on Information Technology and Educational Resources (CITER) of the Faculty of Dentistry | |
2014-01-01 | 2014-02-26 | Library Committee | The Chairman of each Faculty Library Committee and the Chairman of the Committee on Information Technology and Educational Resources (CITER) of the Faculty of Dentistry | |
2013-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | Information Technology Advisory Committee | The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Dentistry Faculty Board |
2013-01-01 | Curriculum Development Committee | The Chairman of each Faculty Curriculum Development Committee | ||
2016-01-05 | 2019-06-30 | HKU Horizons Committee | An Associate Dean (Experiential Learning/Teaching and Learning) from each of the three Faculty clusters nominated by the Faculty cluster concerned, appointed for two years at a time (Cluster A: Architecture, Engineering and Science) | |
2019-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | Academic Awards, Board of | An Associate Dean (Undergraduate Education/Teaching and Learning), appointed on rotational basis for two years at a time, from Faculty Cluster C (Dentistry, Law and Medicine) | |
2021-09-01 | 2022-09-22 | HKU Horizons Committee | An Associate Dean (Experiential Learning/Teaching and Learning) from each of the three Faculty clusters nominated by the Faculty cluster concerned, appointed for two years at a time (Cluster C: Dentistry, Law and Medicine) | |
2022-07-01 | 2023-06-30 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University | |
2013-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | Library Committee | The Chairman of each Faculty Library Committee and the Chairman of the Committee on Information Technology and Educational Resources (CITER) of the Faculty of Dentistry | |
1987-11-01 | 2011-06-30 | Faculty of Dentistry, Board of the | The teachers who are members of the Faculty and who are full-time employees of the University |